EP0924342 - Packaging materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2001 [2001/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECC INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 1015 Arlington Business Park Theale, Reading Berkshire RG7 4SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states ECC INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 1015 Arlington Business Park Theale, Reading, Berkshire RG7 4SA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Preston, Janet Susan 19 Symons Close St. Austell, Cornwall PL25 3EH / GB | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | McCormack, Derek James ECC International Ltd. Patents Department John Keay House St Austell, Cornwall PL25 4DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | McCormack, Derek James ECC International Ltd, Patents Department, John Keay House St Austell, Cornwall PL25 4DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98310335.9 | 16.12.1998 | [1999/25] | Priority number, date | GB19970026921 | 19.12.1997 Original published format: GB 9726921 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0924342 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0924342 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | [2000/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D21H23/50, D21H21/14, D21H19/36, D21H27/10 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
D21H21/14 (EP);
D21H19/385 (EP);
D21H19/40 (EP);
D21H19/44 (EP);
D21H23/50 (EP);
D21H27/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/52] |
Former [1999/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verpackungsmaterial | [1999/25] | English: | Packaging materials | [1999/25] | French: | Matériau d'emballage | [1999/25] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 20.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/17] | 17.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9419199 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 1 * example 9; claims 1,2,15 *; | [XY]EP0760342 (WESTVACO CORP) [X] 19 * page 3, lines 31-40 * [Y] 1; | [XY]EP0664358 (WESTVACO CORP) [X] 19 * page 3, lines 41-56 * [Y] 1; | [Y]US4948664 (BROCINER RONALD E) [Y] 1 * claims 1,3,9,13-16 *; | [Y]WO9411116 (SUNDHOLM PATRICK ;DONNELLY ROBERT (NZ); KANGAS MARTTI (US)) [Y] 1 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 4 * * page 9, paragraph 3 *; | [YDA]US5569318 (JARAND MARK L) [YD] 1 * claim 1 * [A] 7,8 |