Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0931788

EP0931788 - Metalloprotease inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.10.2003  [2003/44]
Applicant(s)For:GB 
Pfizer Limited
Ramsgate Road
Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
For:BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  NL  SE  AT  CY  PT 
Pfizer Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]For:GB 
Pfizer Limited
Ramsgate Road
Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
For:BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  NL  SE  AT  CY  PT 
PFIZER INC.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, N.Y. 10017 / US
Former [2001/03]For:GB 
Pfizer Limited
Ramsgate Road
Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
For:BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  NL  SE  AT  CY  PT 
PFIZER INC.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, N.Y. 10017 / US
Former [1999/30]For:GB 
Pfizer Limited
Ramsgate Road
Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
For:BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  NL  SE  AT  CY  PT  MC 
PFIZER INC.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, N.Y. 10017 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Dack, Kevin Neil
Pfizer Central Research, Ramsgate Road
Sandwich, Kent, CT13 9NJ / GB
02 / Whitlock, Gavin Alistair
Pfizer Central Research, Ramsgate Road
Sandwich, Kent, CT13 9NJ / GB
[1999/30]
Representative(s)Hayles, James Richard
Pfizer
ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/30]Hayles, James Richard
Pfizer Limited, Patents Department, Ramsgate Road
Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
Application number, filing date98310350.816.12.1998
[1999/30]
Priority number, dateGB1998000169027.01.1998         Original published format: GB 9801690
[1999/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0931788
Date:28.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0931788
Date:04.08.1999
[1999/31]
Type: A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication 
No.:EP0931788
Date:01.03.2000
[2000/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0931788
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07C311/03, C07C311/04, C07C311/06, A61K31/18, A61K31/275
[1999/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
Former [1999/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Metalloproteinase-Inhibitoren[1999/30]
English:Metalloprotease inhibitors[1999/30]
French:Inhibiteurs de la métalloprotéinase[1999/30]
Examination procedure20.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/30]
12.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.08.2002Fee for grant paid
14.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0606046  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [DA] 1,19,22 * page 2; claims 1,24 *;
 [A]WO9535275  (BRITISH BIOTECH PHARM [GB], et al) [A] 1,19,22 * page 4 - page 6; claims 1,20 *;
 [E]WO9902493  (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [E] 26 * page 7 *