blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0930584

EP0930584 - Method and apparatus for displaying panoramas with video data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.08.2006
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.08.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.09.2006  [2006/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/42]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Former [1999/29]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Cheng, Keh-shin Fu
58 Carmine Drive
Mahopac, New York 10541 / US
02 / Kumar, Keeranoor G.
9 Nottingham Circle
Peekskill, New York 10566 / US
03 / Lipscomb, James Sargent
1646 Paine Street
Yorktown Heights, New York / US
04 / Menon, Jai Prakash
55 Campus Road
Peekhill, New York 10566 / US
05 / Willebeek-Lemair, Marc Hubert
1480 Baptist Church Road
Yorktown Heights, New York 10598 / US
[1999/29]
Representative(s)Burt, Roger James, et al
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester
Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/37]Burt, Roger James, Dr., et al
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park
Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Former [1999/29]Burrington, Alan Graham Headford
Alan Burrington & Associates 41 The Street Ashtead
Surrey KT21 1AA / GB
Application number, filing date98310518.021.12.1998
[1999/29]
Priority number, dateUS1998000772915.01.1998         Original published format: US 7729
[1999/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0930584
Date:21.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0930584
Date:06.11.2002
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0930584
Date:19.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.09.2002
ClassificationIPC:G06T15/10
[1999/29]
CPC:
H04N19/00 (EP,US); G06T1/00 (KR); H04N19/23 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/30]
Former [1999/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Anzeige von Panoramen mit Videodaten[1999/29]
English:Method and apparatus for displaying panoramas with video data[1999/29]
French:Procédé et dispositif d'afichage de panoramas avec des données vidéo[1999/29]
Examination procedure25.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/04]
28.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.05.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
28.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
15.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.2005Fee for grant paid
23.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.06.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9621321  (ANDERSON DAVID P [US]) [Y] 1-10 * page 8, line 6 - line 29 * * page 15, line 15 - line 27 * * page 18, line 4 - line 10 * * page 78, line 29 - page 80, line 4 * * page 83, line 12 - line 25 * * page 85, line 1 - line 30 *;
 [Y]WO9703416  (SARNOFF DAVID RES CENTER [US]) [Y] 1,3-7,9,10 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 14, paragraph 2 - page 14, paragraph 3 *;
 [DY]  - SHENCHANG ERIC CHEN, "QUICKTIME VR - AN IMAGE-BASED APPROACH TO VIRTUAL ENVIRONMENT NAVIGATION", COMPUTER GRAPHICS PROCEEDINGS. LOS ANGELES, AUG. 6 - 11, 1995, COMPUTER GRAPHICS PROCEEDINGS (SIGGRAPH), NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19950806), ISBN 0-89791-701-4, pages 29 - 38, XP000546213 [DY] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * * page 32, column 2, paragraph L - page 34, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 35, column 2, paragraph 7 - page 36, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 36, column 1, paragraph L - page 36, column 2, paragraph 1 *
 [Y]  - BLONDE L ET AL, "A VIRTUAL STUDIO FOR LIVE BROADCASTING: THE MONA LISA PROJECT", IEEE MULTIMEDIA, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, US, (19960601), vol. 3, no. 2, ISSN 1070-986X, pages 18 - 28, XP000594152 [Y] 1,3,4,6,7,9,10 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/93.502291
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.