EP0925925 - Method for correcting a recording head, correction apparatus therefor, recording head corrected by use of such apparatus, and recording apparatus using such recording head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.2004 [2004/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayasaki, Kimiyuki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yamakawa, Koji Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Orikasa, Tsuyoshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kigami, Hiroyuki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Fukai, Hisashi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Ono, Takayuki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Okawa, Masayoshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 08 /
Kudo, Satoshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98310632.9 | 23.12.1998 | [1999/26] | Priority number, date | JP19970359801 | 26.12.1997 Original published format: JP 35980197 | [1999/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0925925 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0925925 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/05, B41J29/393 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
B41J2/04508 (EP,US);
B41J2/04536 (EP,US);
B41J2/04563 (EP,US);
B41J2/04565 (EP,US);
B41J2/0458 (EP,US);
B41J2/04588 (EP,US);
B41J2/04591 (EP,US);
B41J2/04598 (EP,US);
B41J29/393 (EP,US);
B41J2202/21 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/39] |
Former [1999/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Korrigieren eines Aufzeichnungskopfes, Korrigiervorrichtung dazu, mit dieser Vorrichtung korrigierter Aufzeichnungskopf und diesen Aufzeichnungskopf verwendende Aufzeichnungsvorrichtung | [1999/26] | English: | Method for correcting a recording head, correction apparatus therefor, recording head corrected by use of such apparatus, and recording apparatus using such recording head | [1999/26] | French: | Procédé de correction d'une tête d'enregistrement, appareil de correction pour sa mise en oeuvre, tête d'enregistrement corrigée en utilisant un tel appareil et appareil d'enregistrement utilisant une telle tête d'enregistrement | [1999/26] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 29.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/49] | 15.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0729115 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 21 * column 4, line 22 - line 33; figure - * [A] 1,6,9,10; | [XA]EP0670219 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 21 * column 5, line 5 - line 39 * * column 7, line 45 - column 9, line 4 * * figure - * [A] 1,6,9,10; | [A]US5574544 (YOSHINO KUNIHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,9,10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0532248 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,6,9,10 * abstract * * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 29 *; | [A]EP0347341 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1,6,9,10 * page 2, line 60 - page 3, line 6 *; | [A]EP0527610 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,6,9,10 * column 6, line 15 - line 55 * * column 7, line 55 - column 8, line 34 *; | [A]JPH0542683 ; | [A]JPH09186877 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930625), vol. 017, no. 336, Database accession no. (M - 1435), & JP05042683 A 19930223 (CANON INC) [A] 1,6,9,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09186877 A 19970715 (SHARP CORP) [A] 6,9,10 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS55132253 | JPH022009 | JPH04229278 | JPH04232749 | JPH0524192 | US5016023 | JPH0634558 | US4723129 |