Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0925951

EP0925951 - Printing apparatus and print method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2006/13]
Former [1999/26]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Miura, Yasushi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Miyake, Hiroyuki
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Kuriyama, Hiroyuki
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Shimizu, Masashi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
05 / Ikeda, Chikanobu
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
06 / Watanabe, Shigeru
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1999/26]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/26]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date98310687.323.12.1998
[1999/26]
Priority number, dateJP1997035500824.12.1997         Original published format: JP 35500897
[1999/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0925951
Date:30.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0925951
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0925951
Date:29.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B41J29/393, B41J2/165
[2000/03]
Former International [1999/26]B41J29/393
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/38]
Former [1999/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Druckgerät und Druckverfahren[1999/26]
English:Printing apparatus and print method[1999/26]
French:Appareil et méthode d'impression[1999/26]
Examination procedure05.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/31]
31.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.2005Fee for grant paid
29.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
19.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
20.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
02.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL29.03.2006
ES10.07.2006
[2007/21]
Former [2006/50]ES10.07.2006
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0744295  (CANON KK) [X] 1-3,5,6,9-11,13,16-19,21 * figures 2,5,8,11,12 * * column 8, line 46 - line 49 * * column 15, line 36 - line 38 * * column 1, line 44 - line 57 * * column 11, line 30 - line 36 * * column 23, line 3 - line 16 * * column 14, line 43 - line 54 * [Y] 7,8,12,20;
 [Y]EP0783973  (CANON KK) [Y] 7,8,12,20 * figures 1A-1G,,5A,5B * * page 6, line 5 - page 7, line 5 *;
 [Y]EP0694396  (CANON KK) [Y] 7,8,12,20 * figures 1A-1G,8,9 * * column 13, line 1 - column 14, line 6 * * column 19, line 21 - line 23 *;
 [XAY]EP0559370  (CANON KK) [X] 21 * figures 27,28 * * page 3, line 50 - page 4, line 7 * * page 5, line 21 - line 22 * * page 17, line 36 - line 44 * [A] 10,11 [Y] 7,8,12,20;
 [A]EP0749842  (CANON KK) [A] 1-3,6,10,13-16 * figures 2,4-6 * * column 1, line 21 - line 24 * * column 8, line 45 - column 12, line 26 * * column 12, line 35 - line 50 *;
 [A]EP0752316  (CANON KK) [A] 1,3,6,9,13-19,21 * figures 1,2 * * page 7, line 16 - line 38 *;
 [A]EP0500281  (CANON KK) [A] 1,10,11,16,19,21 * abstract * * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 15 *;
 [A]JPS60240460
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860423), vol. 010, no. 109, Database accession no. (M - 472), & JP60240460 A 19851129 (FUJI XEROX KK) [A] 4 * abstract *
by applicantUS4723129
 US4740796
 US4463359
 US4345262
 US4313124
 US4558333
 US4459600
 JPS59123670