blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0928667


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.11.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  18.12.2002  [2002/51]
05.07.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn
23.04.2002 Change - extension states
04.02.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
22.01.2002 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
22.01.2002 Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973)
04.01.2002 Definitive list of designations published on  20.02.2002  [2002/08]
06.04.2001 Publication of search report published on  23.05.2001 [2001/21]
07.02.2001 Surcharge for renewal fee
07.02.2001 Renewal fee
01.02.2001 Surcharge for renewal fee
28.05.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  14.07.1999 [1999/28]