Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0928667

EP0928667 - Internal combustion fastener driving tool aluminium cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.11.2002
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.12.2002  [2002/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Porter-Cable Corporation
4825 Highway 45 North, P.O. Box 2468 Jackson
Tennessee 38302-2468 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/28]For all designated states
Porter-Cable Corporation
4825 Highway 45 North, P.O. Box 2468
Jackson, Tennessee 38302-2468 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Phillips, Alan
200 Willow Green Drive
Jackson, Tennessee 38305 / US
[1999/28]
Representative(s)Pawlyn, Anthony Neil
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/28]Pawlyn, Anthony Neil
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Tower House, Merrion Way
Leeds, West Yorkshire LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date98310766.529.12.1998
[1999/28]
Priority number, dateUS1997000219931.12.1997         Original published format: US 2199
[1999/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0928667
Date:14.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0928667
Date:23.05.2001
[2001/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:B25C1/08
[1999/28]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/08]
Former [1999/28]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verbrennungskraftbetriebenes Werkzeug zum Eintreiben von Befestigungsmitteln mit Wechselventil[1999/28]
English:Internal combustion fastener driving tool aluminium cylinder[1999/28]
French:Outil entraîné par gaz de combustion pour enforcer des attaches avec clapet avec soupape à tiroir[1999/28]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
24.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/51]
10.07.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.01.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
29.01.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200003   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2001
31.12.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US4905634  (VELDMAN ALPHONSUS G [NZ]) [X] 1,6 * column A * * column 1, lines 16-18 * * column 4, lines 7-24 * * column 14, lines 15-20; figures 7,13,14,22,23 * [A] 5,9,18 [Y] 3,4,7;
 [YA]EP0703356  (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 3,4 * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 23 * * column 7, lines 11-17 * [A] 2;
 [A]EP0592946  (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 2,4 * page 2, lines 1-13 * * page 4, lines 1-19 *;
 [DY]US4712379  (ADAMS JOSEPH S [CA], et al) [DY] 7 * column A; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4773581  (OHTSU SHINKI [JP], et al) [A] 6-8 * figures 8,9 *;
 [DA]US4510748  (ADAMS JOSEPH S [CA]) [DA] 7 * column A * * column 4, lines 8-49; figures 1-11 *