Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0870485

EP0870485 - Modular liner for limb stump prosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.08.2005
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Helmy, Nashat N.
2035 Ordway Road Golden Valley
Minnesota 55422 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/42]For all designated states
Helmy, Nashat N.
2035 Ordway Road
Golden Valley, Minnesota 55422 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/42]
Representative(s)Derambure, Christian
BREESE DERAMBURE MAJEROWICZ
38, avenue de l'Opéra
75002 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1998/42]Derambure, Christian
Bouju Derambure Bugnion, 52, rue de Monceau
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98400770.801.04.1998
[1998/42]
Priority number, dateUS1997083114901.04.1997         Original published format: US 831149
[1998/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0870485
Date:14.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0870485
Date:30.08.2000
[2000/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0870485
Date:13.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/78
[1998/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/20]
Former [1998/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Modulare Hülle für eine Gliedstumpfprothese[1998/42]
English:Modular liner for limb stump prosthesis[1998/42]
French:Gaine modulaire pour prothèse de moignon de membre[1998/42]
Examination procedure27.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
24.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2004Fee for grant paid
30.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200003   M06   Fee paid on   25.10.2000
30.04.200205   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.2002
30.04.200407   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.2004
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT13.10.2004
NL13.10.2004
[2008/15]
Former [2006/14]NL13.10.2004
Documents cited:Search[E]WO9855055  (CASPERS CARL A [US]) [E] 9 * page 7, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * page 11, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 3 * * page 15, paragraph 2 - page 16, paragraph 1 * * page 19, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; figures 4,11,12 *;
 [A]WO9629033  (ARBOGAST ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1,4,5,9,10 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 14, paragraph 2 - page 15, paragraph 1 *;
 [A]US5549709  (CASPERS CARL A [US]) [A] 2,3,9-11 * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 49 * * column 7, line 30 - line 34; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]  SANDERS J E, "INTERFACE MECHANICS IN EXTERNAL PROSTHETICS: REVIEW OF INTERFACE STRESS MEASUREMENT TECHNIQUES", MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL ENGINEERING AND COMPUTING,GB,PETER PEREGRINUS LTD. STEVENAGE, (19950701), vol. 33, no. 4, ISSN 0140-0118, pages 509 - 516, XP000516471 [A] 4-7,9
by applicantUS5446443
 US5405405
 US5387245
 US5314497
 US5246464
 US5139523
 US5133776
 US5108456