Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0869580

EP0869580 - Connector with integrated secondary lock [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tyco Electronics France SAS
29, Chaussée Jules César
95300 Pontoise / FR
[2002/46]
Former [1998/41]For all designated states
Proner Comatel
38-40, Allée du Closeau, Zone Industrielle des Richardets
93160 Noisy-Le-Grand / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Creux, Francis
2, Rue du Taillefer
38320 Eybens / FR
[1998/41]
Representative(s)Laget, Jean-Loup
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[N/P]
Former [1998/41]Laget, Jean-Loup
Cabinet Loyer, 78, avenue Raymond Poincaré
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98400791.403.04.1998
[1998/41]
Priority number, dateFR1997000416504.04.1997         Original published format: FR 9704165
[1998/41]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0869580
Date:07.10.1998
Language:FR
[1998/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0869580
Date:27.11.2002
Language:FR
[2002/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP20.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/436
[1998/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT [1999/26]
Former [1999/24]DE,  ES,  IT 
Former [1998/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verbinder mit integrierter sekondärer Verriegelung[1998/41]
English:Connector with integrated secondary lock[1998/41]
French:Connecteur à verrou secondaire intégré[1998/41]
Examination procedure22.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/20]
24.02.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2002Fee for grant paid
27.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES04.04.2003
[2005/02]
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9634429  (FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INT [FR], et al) [X] 1-6,8,10-12 * page 4, line 27 - page 9, line 28 * * page 11, line 6 - line 14; figures 1,2,11 * [Y] 7,9;
 [YA]EP0691710  (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [Y] 7,9 * page 3, column 4, line 16 - page 4, column 5, line 26; figure 6 * [A] 1-6,8,10-12;
 [A]GB2294818  (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0762550  (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 3, column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 38; figures 1A-2B *