EP0887833 - Process for preparing phosphor pattern for field emission panel and photosensitive element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/01] | Process for preparing phosphor pattern for field emission panel, photosensitive element for field emission display panel, phosphor pattern for field emission display panel and field emission display panel | ||
[2006/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | ||
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 160 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tai, Seiji 21-26, Suwa-cho 5-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Horibe, Yoshiyuki 42-97, Ishinazaka-1 chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Hiroyuki Byupare Mito, 3-3-702, Joto 2-chome Mito-Shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 04 /
Nojiri, Takeshi Erudimu Hirasawa 203, 3656-1, Shimogou Iwama-cho Nishi-Ibaraki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 05 /
Satou, Kazuya 5-A102, Naka-narusawa-cho 1-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 06 /
Kimura, Naoki Namekawa-ryo 304, 20-13,Higashi-namekawa-cho 1-chome, Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 07 /
Shimamura, Mariko Mutsumi-ryo 201, 14-10, Motomiya-cho, 4 chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | [2006/09] |
Former [1999/01] | 01 /
Tai, Seiji 21-26, Suwa-cho 5-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Horibe, Yoshiyuki 42-97, Ishinazaka-1 chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Tanaka, Hiroyuki Byupare Mito, 3-3-702, Joto 2-chome Mito-Shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Nojiri, Takeshi Erudimu Hirasawa 203, 3656-1, Shimogou Iwama-cho Nishi-Ibaraki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Satou, Kazuya 5-A102, Naka-narusawa-cho 1-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
06 /
Kimura, Naoki Namekawa-ryo 304, 20-13, Higashi-namekawa-cho, 1 chome, Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
07 /
Shimamura, Mariko Mutsumi-ryo 201, 14-10, Motomiya-cho, 4 chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Nargolwalla, Cyra, et al Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Nargolwalla, Cyra, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1999/01] | Koch, Gustave, et al Cabinet PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98401222.9 | 20.05.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | JP19970132254 | 22.05.1997 Original published format: JP 13225497 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0887833 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0887833 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0887833 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01J9/227 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
H01J9/2271 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, NL [2000/41] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Phosphormusters für eine Feldemissionsanzeigetafel und photoempfindliches Element | [2006/05] | English: | Process for preparing phosphor pattern for field emission panel and photosensitive element | [2006/05] | French: | Procédé pour préparer un motif luminescent pour un panneau d'affichage à effet de champ et élément photosensible | [2006/05] |
Former [1999/01] | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Phosphormusters für ein Feldemissionsanzeigetafel, photoempfindliches Element und Phosphormuster für ein Feldemissionsanzeigetafel und Feldemissionsanzeigetafel | ||
Former [1999/01] | Process for preparing phosphor pattern for field emission panel, photosensitive element for field emission display panel, phosphor pattern for field emission display panel and field emission display panel | ||
Former [1999/01] | Procédé pour préparar un motif luminescent pour un panneau d'affichage à effet de champ, élément photosensible et motif luminescent pour un panneau d'affichage à effet de champ et panneau d'affichage à effet de champ | Examination procedure | 11.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 03.08.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE | 10.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LI | 16.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 06.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2005 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.01.2006 | 09.12.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.09.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH01272027 ; | [X]JPH04322036 ; | [XP]WO9731387 (CANDESCENT TECH CORP [US]) [XP] 1 * claims 1-34 *; | [E]EP0865067 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1,8 * claims 1-11 *; | [PA]EP0785565 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1,8 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0768573 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,8 * claims 1-19 *; | [PA]JPH09244230 ; | [A]US3753710 (JONES R, et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900124), vol. 014, no. 038, Database accession no. (E - 878), & JP01272027 A 19891031 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1,8,11 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930329), vol. 017, no. 160, Database accession no. (E - 1342), & JP04322036 A 19921112 (NORITAKE CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1,6,11 * abstract * | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09244230 A 19970919 (HITACHI CHEM CO LTD) [PA] 8,10 * abstract * |