blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0974356 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0974356



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 389
20.08.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
19.10.2006 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
19.10.2006 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
19.10.2006 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
05.08.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.07.2006 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.07.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.07.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.07.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.07.2006 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
03.07.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 9
03.07.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.07.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 7
18.05.2006 Claims Opposition 1
18.05.2006 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.05.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) Opposition 5
18.05.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.05.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.05.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.05.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
12.05.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
11.05.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.05.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.04.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.04.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.04.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.04.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.04.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.03.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.03.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2006 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 8
23.03.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
23.03.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
20.03.2006 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
20.03.2006 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
20.03.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.03.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
20.03.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
17.03.2006 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
17.03.2006 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
17.03.2006 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
17.03.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
17.03.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.03.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.03.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
17.03.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
31.01.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.01.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.01.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.01.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.01.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.12.2005 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
28.12.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.12.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.12.2005 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.02.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.02.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2005 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 8
10.02.2005 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
07.02.2005 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 8
07.02.2005 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
02.12.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.12.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
29.11.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.11.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
29.07.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
29.07.2004 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
30.06.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.06.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.06.2004 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
23.06.2004 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
23.06.2004 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
23.06.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
23.06.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
23.06.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.06.2004 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
23.06.2004 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
22.06.2004 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
22.06.2004 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
14.08.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.05.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.05.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
15.05.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
04.04.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
28.02.2003 Request for change of name Search / examination 7
15.01.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.01.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
15.01.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 9
17.12.2002 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
17.12.2002 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
13.12.2002 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.12.2002 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.10.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
07.10.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.02.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
18.02.2002 Drawings Search / examination 1
18.02.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
11.02.2002 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
05.02.2002 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
10.12.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
10.12.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.06.2001 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 3
20.06.2001 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.05.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.04.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.04.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.12.2000 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
29.12.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.07.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
25.07.2000 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
14.06.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
14.06.2000 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
11.04.2000 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
21.03.2000 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
01.02.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
15.12.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
26.07.1999 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
26.07.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
15.07.1999 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
26.01.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
26.01.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.01.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
15.07.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.07.1998 Claims Search / examination 1
15.07.1998 Description Search / examination 5
15.07.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.07.1998 Drawings Search / examination 3
15.07.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7