blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0974356


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.10.2006 Revocation of patent published on  22.11.2006  [2006/47]
29.06.2006 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.06.2006 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
12.05.2006 Change - representative published on  14.06.2006  [2006/24]
23.12.2005 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
15.02.2005 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.11.2004 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
26.07.2004 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
25.06.2004 Unpublished change to opponent data
25.06.2004 Opposition filed published on  11.08.2004  [2004/33]
08.08.2003 (Expected) grant published on  24.09.2003  [2003/39]
01.08.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.05.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.04.2003 Change - applicant published on  21.05.2003  [2003/21]
13.01.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.12.2002 Change - classification published on  05.02.2003  [2003/06]
27.12.2002 Change - classification published on  05.02.2003  [2003/06]
27.12.2002 Change - German title published on  05.02.2003  [2003/06]
13.12.2002 Examination report or reply
02.10.2002 Examination report or reply
29.07.2002 Renewal fee
01.03.2002 Examination report or reply
15.02.2002 Change - representative published on  03.04.2002  [2002/14]
05.12.2001 Examination report or reply
01.08.2001 Renewal fee
02.07.2001 Examination report or reply
15.05.2001 Examination report or reply
29.12.2000 First examination report
22.12.2000 Examination report or reply
18.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  04.10.2000 [2000/40]
01.08.2000 Renewal fee
20.06.2000 Change - extension states
16.06.2000 Request for examination filed published on  02.08.2000 [2000/31]
11.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]