blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0974356 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP04008415 EP10185329 EP98401781 EP99940114



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002520371Global Dossier 09.07.2002A
Priority number Date
EP9905571 12.07.1999
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2269613Global Dossier 17.10.2012A3
EP2269613 05.01.2011A2
Priority number Date
EP10185329 12.07.1999
EP98401781 15.07.1998
EP99940114 12.07.1999
EP04008415 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1435240Global Dossier 12.08.2009A3
EP1435240 07.07.2004A2
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
EP99940114 12.07.1999
EP04008415 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1011684Global Dossier 28.06.2000A2
Priority number Date
EP9905571 12.07.1999
EP98401781 15.07.1998
EP99940114 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AP1450 25.07.2005A
Priority number Date
EP9905571 12.07.1999
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU753604B 24.10.2002B2
AU5417999 07.02.2000A
Priority number Date
EP9905571 12.07.1999
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003261560 26.05.2005A1
Priority number Date
AU5417999 12.07.1999
EP9905571 12.07.1999
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9906600 18.07.2000A
Priority number Date
EP9905571 12.07.1999
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2303537 06.12.2005C
CA2303537 27.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP9905571 12.07.1999
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20040053177 23.06.2004A
Priority number Date
EP9905571 12.07.1999
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ503248 27.09.2002A
Priority number Date
EP9905571 12.07.1999
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PT974356E 27.02.2004E
Priority number Date
EP9905571 12.07.1999
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
USRE38629E 19.10.2004E
Priority number Date
US32942602 27.12.2002
EP98401781 15.07.1998
US35314199 14.07.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO0003742Global Dossier 20.04.2000A3
WO0003742 27.01.2000A2
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2003292443Global Dossier 15.10.2003A
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0974356Global Dossier 24.09.2003B1
EP0974356 26.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR013052 22.11.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR065970 15.07.2009A2
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT250418T 15.10.2003T
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1146427C 21.04.2004C
CN1275082 29.11.2000A
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1486698 07.04.2004A
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69818444T 06.05.2004T2
DE69818444D 30.10.2003D1
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK0974356T 27.10.2003T3
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DZ2846 01.12.2003A1
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2206868T 16.05.2004T3
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ID25784 02.11.2000A
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MA24930 01.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MY129552 30.04.2007A
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
OA11400 08.04.2004A
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2226396 10.04.2004C2
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2286788 10.11.2006C2
RU2003126257 27.02.2005A
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SI0974356T 31.12.2003T1
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW555560B 01.10.2003B
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI245632B 21.12.2005B
TW200303208 01.09.2003A
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6303146 16.10.2001B1
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
UY25611 21.08.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ZA200001159 31.05.2001B
Priority number Date
EP98401781 15.07.1998