blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0974356

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 CH 
CY 
 DE 
 DK 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 IE 
 IT 
 LI 
 LU 
 MC 
 NL 
 PT 
 SE 
Examination procedure15.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
17.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted24.09.2003
Opposition procedure03.07.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:02.08.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000608
 
Event date:04.10.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:04.10.2000 
Event description:PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES
Free Format Text:AL PAYMENT 20000608;LT PAYMENT 20000608;LV PAYMENT 20000608;MK PAYMENT 20000608;RO PAYMENT 20000608;SI PAYMENT 20000608
 
Event date:14.02.2001 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20001229
 
Event date:05.02.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7A 61K 31/64 A
 
Event date:05.02.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7A 61K 31/155 B
 
Event date:05.02.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7A 61K 31/64 J
 
Event date:05.02.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7A 61K 31:155 J
 
Event date:05.02.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7A 61P 5:50 J
 
Event date:21.05.2003 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:MERCK SANTE
 
Event date:24.09.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:24.09.2003 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL LT LV MK RO SI
 
Event date:24.09.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:30.09.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Event date:30.09.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:BRAUN & PARTNER PATENT-, MARKEN-, RECHTSANWAELTE
 
Event date:29.10.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:30.10.2003 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69818444
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20031030
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:17.11.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20030404160 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
 
Event date:25.11.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:16.05.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2206868 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:18.06.2004 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:11.08.2004 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:ABIOGEN PHARMA S.P.A.
Effective DATE:20040622
 
Event date:01.10.2004 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:ABIOGEN PHARMA S.P.A.
 
Event date:10.01.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SI IF
Code Expl.:+VALID ON THE PRS DATE
 
Event date:15.06.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20060615
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:16.06.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20060616
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:16.06.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Payment DATE:20060616
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:16.06.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20060616
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:19.06.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20060619
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:19.06.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20060619
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:21.06.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Payment DATE:20060621
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:21.06.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20060621
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:21.06.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20060621
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:22.06.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20060622
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:26.06.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20060626
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:27.06.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20060627
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:29.06.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20060629
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:13.07.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20060713
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:13.07.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20060713
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:17.07.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20060717
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:26.07.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20060726
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.07.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20060731
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:22.11.2006 
Event description:PATENT REVOKED
Effective DATE:20060518
 
Event date:22.11.2006 
Event description:GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE
Free Format Text:20060518
 
Event date:30.11.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:29.12.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT MP4A
Code Expl.:-REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20061106
 
Event date:02.01.2007 
Event description:NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION
Effective DATE:20060518
 
Event date:13.03.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE ECNC
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM THE REGISTER
 
Event date:30.04.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SI KO00
Code Expl.:-LAPSE OF PATENT
Effective DATE:20080301