Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974356

EP0974356 - Tablets comprising a combination of metformin and glibenclamide [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  20.10.2006
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.10.2006Revocation of patentpublished on 22.11.2006  [2006/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Sante
37, rue Saint Romain
69008 Lyon / FR
[2003/21]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
LIPHA
37, rue Saint-Romain
69008 Lyon / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Bonhomme, Yves
Le Buclay, 21 avenue de la Paix
69260 Charbonnières les Bains / FR
02 / Nicholson, Geoffrey
48 Langdon Avenue
Aylesbury, Buckinghamshire HP21 9UT / GB
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Kling, Simone , et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2006/24]Kling, Simone , et al
Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2002/14]Bernasconi, Jean Raymond , et al
c/o Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2000/04]Le Guen, Gérard , et al
CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date98401781.415.07.1998
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974356
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974356
Date:24.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/64, A61K31/155, // (A61K31/64, 31:155, A61P5:50)
[2003/06]
Former International [2000/04]A61K31/64, // (A61K31/64, 31:155)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
Extension statesAL08.06.2000
LT08.06.2000
LV08.06.2000
MK08.06.2000
RO08.06.2000
SI08.06.2000
TitleGerman:Tabletten enthaltend eine Kombination von Glibenclamid und Metformin[2003/06]
English:Tablets comprising a combination of metformin and glibenclamide[2000/04]
French:Comprimés contenant une combinaison de glibenclamide et de metformine[2000/04]
Former [2000/04]Tabletten enthaltend eine Kombination von Glibenclamide und Metformine
Examination procedure08.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/31]
29.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2003Fee for grant paid
15.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.06.2004   
ABIOGEN PHARMA S.p.A.
Via Maucci, 36
56014 Ospedaletto (PI) / IT
Opponent's representative
Minoja, Fabrizio, et al
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l.
Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
 [N/P]
Former [2004/33]
Opponent(s)01  22.06.2004   
ABIOGEN PHARMA S.p.A.
Via Maucci, 36
56014 Ospedaletto (PI) / IT
Opponent's representative
Minoja, Fabrizio, Dr., et al
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Rossini, 8
20122 Milano / IT
29.07.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.02.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.05.2006Date of oral proceedings
18.05.2006Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/47]
03.07.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.07.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
17.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9717975  (GENTILI IST SPA ;BARELLI GIULIO (IT); REGIS MASSIMO DE (IT)) [Y] 1-4 * claim - *;
 [Y]US4060634  (ROTHE WERNER ET AL) [Y] 1-4 * column 4, line 32 - line 49 *