Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974357

EP0974357 - Chemokines as adjuvants of immune response [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.06.2001
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.08.2001 [2001/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCHERING-PLOUGH
92, rue Baudin
92307 Levallois-Perret Cédex / FR
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Caux, Christophe
1 Rue de Savoie
69002 Lyon / FR
02 / Vanbervliet, Béatrice
Bâtiment B, Allée des Terrasses
69570 Dardilly / FR
03 / Lebecque, Serge
54 Chemin du Marand
69380 Civrieux d'Azergues / FR
04 / Vicari, Alain
6 Rue Juiverie
69005 Lyon / FR
05 / Dieu, Marie-Caroline
164 Rue Francis de Pressenssé
69100 Villeurbanne / FR
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Bentz, Jean-Paul , et al
Cabinet Weinstein
56A Rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/03]Bentz, Jean-Paul , et al
Cabinet Weinstein, 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2000/04]Durand, Yves Armand Louis , et al
CABINET WEINSTEIN 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98401799.616.07.1998
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974357
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/19
[2000/04]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/40]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Chemokine als Adjuvantien der Immunantwort[2000/04]
English:Chemokines as adjuvants of immune response[2000/04]
French:Chemokines comme adjuvants de la réponse immunitaire[2000/04]
Examination procedure27.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/32]
05.03.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/32]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.10.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
11.10.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9801557  (SCHERING CORP [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 41, line 20 - page 42, line 14 * * claim - *;
 [X]WO9814573  (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 5, line 9 - page 6, line 25 * * claim - *;
 [X]WO9731098  (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 3, line 4 - line 10 * * claim - *;
 [X]WO9517092  (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 18 - page 19 *;
 [X]WO9634891  (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 17 *;
 [X]WO9421277  (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US]) [X] 1-20 * claim - *;
 [X]WO9719696  (LUSSO PAOLO [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * claim - *;
 [X]WO9741831  (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 10, line 6 - page 11, line 9; claim - *;
 [X]WO9407521  (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [X] 1-20 * claim - *;
 [X]WO9413321  (INDIANA UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION [US]) [X] 1-20 * claim - *;
 [X]  FIORETTI F. ET AL, "Reduced Tumorigenicity and Augmented Leukocyte Infiltration After Monocyte Chemotactic Protein-3 (MCP-3) Gene Transfer: Perivascular Accumulation of Dentritic Cells in Peritumoral Tissue and Neutrophil Recruitment Within the Tumor", J. IMMUNOL., (19980701), vol. 161, no. 1, pages 342 - 346, XP002085641 [X] 1-20 * abstract * * page 342 - page 343, column L, paragraph 2 *
 [A]  DEMATOS P. ET AL, "Pulsing of Dentritic Cells With Cell Lysates From Either B16 Melanoma or MCA-106 Fibrosarcoma Yields Equally Effective Vaccines Against B16 Tumors in Mice", J. SURG. ONCOL. (UNITED STATES), (199806), vol. 68, no. 2, pages 79 - 91, XP002085642 [A] 1-20 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1096-9098(199806)68:2<79::AID-JSO3>3.0.CO;2-H