Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0898323

EP0898323 - Polarisation branch for two different frequency bands [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.05.2005
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/08]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Seewig, Udo, Dipl.-Ing.
Rotdornweg 16
30855 Langenhagen / DE
02 / Nagel, Reimer, Dr.-Ing.
Schneppenhorststrasse 6
30457 Hannover / DE
03 / Wojtkowiak, Daniel, Dr.-Ing.
Am Querfeld 10
31535 Neustadt / DE
[1999/08]
Representative(s)Rausch, Gabriele , et al
Alcatel Intellectual Property Department Stuttgart
70430 Stuttgart / DE
[2008/33]
Former [2004/45]Rausch, Gabriele, Dr. , et al
Alcatel Intellectual Property Department Stuttgart
70430 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1999/08]Döring, Roger, Dipl.-Ing.
Alcatel Alsthom, Intellectual Property Department, Kabelkamp 20
30179 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date98401839.020.07.1998
[1999/08]
Priority number, dateDE199713554716.08.1997         Original published format: DE 19735547
[1999/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0898323
Date:24.02.1999
Language:DE
[1999/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0898323
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01P1/213
[1999/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/50]
Former [1999/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Polarisationsweiche für zwei unterschiedliche Frequenzbänder[1999/08]
English:Polarisation branch for two different frequency bands[1999/08]
French:Aiguillage de polarisation pour deux bandes de fréquence différentes[1999/08]
Examination procedure13.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/19]
30.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/28]
14.02.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0096461  (ANDREW CORP [US]) [AD] 1-3 * column 4, line 19 - column 5, line 51 * * column 8, line 13 - column 8, line 43; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4956622  (DE RONDE FRANS C [GB]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 13 - column 2, line 52; figure 2A *;
 [A]  BOIFOT A M, "CLASSIFICATION OF ORTHO-MODE TRANSDUCERS", EUROPEAN TRANSACTIONS ON TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND RELATED TECHNOLOGIES,IT,AEI, MILANO, vol. 2, no. 5, ISSN 1120-3862, page 35-42, XP000266379 [A] 1 * page 41, column L, line 10 - column R, line 6; figure 12 *
 [A]  DAS B N ET AL, "A RIGOROUS VARIATIONAL FORMULATION OF AN H PLANE SLOT-COUPLED TEE JUNCTION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, vol. 38, no. 1, ISSN 0018-9480, page 93-95, XP000142212 [A] 1 * page 93, column R, line 4 - column R, line 23; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/22.44163
 [A]  MA Z ET AL, "EFFICIENT CHARACTERIZATION OF COMPLEX H-PLANE WAVEGUIDE PI-JUNCTIONAND CROSS-JUNCTIONS", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRONICS,JP,INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, vol. E79-C, no. 3, ISSN 0916-8524, page 444-452, XP000594520 [A] 1 * page 444 - page 445; figure 1 *