Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978584

EP0978584 - Fibrous structure and absorbent article including such a fibrous structure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.06.2010
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude
75, Quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
For all designated states
SCA RESEARCH AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
For all designated states
SOFTAL Electronic GmbH
König-Georg-Stieg 1
21107 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]For all designated states
L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude
75, quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
For all designated states
SCA RESEARCH AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
For all designated states
SOFTAL Electronic GmbH
König-Georg-Stieg 1
21107 Hamburg / DE
Former [2007/26]For all designated states
L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude
75, quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
For all designated states
SCA RESEARCH AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
For all designated states
SOFTAL Electronic GmbH
König-Georg-Stieg 1
D-21107 Hamburg / CH
Former [2007/17]For all designated states
L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
For all designated states
SCA RESEARCH AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
For all designated states
SOFTAL Electronic GmbH
König-Georg-Stieg 1
D-21107 Hamburg / CH
Former [2002/17]For all designated states
L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
For all designated states
SCA RESEARCH AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
For all designated states
SOFTAL Electronic GmbH
König-Georg-Stieg 1
D-21107 Hamburg / CH
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
For all designated states
SCA RESEARCH AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
For all designated states
SOFTAL Electronic GmbH
König-Georg-Stieg 1
D-21107 Hamburg / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Chihani, Thami
Rida Portar 7
435 32 Molnlycke / SE
02 / Cocolios, Panayotis
92, rue de l'Acquisition
78830 Bullion / FR
03 / Coeuret, François
63, Boulevard Beethoven
Les Symphonies, 78280 Guyancourt / FR
04 / Nihlstrand, Anna
Kabbeleksgatan 5D
417 18 Goteborg / SE
05 / Villermet, Alain
5, rue Welschinger
78220 Viroflay / FR
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Andersson, Per Rune , et al
Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2006/22]Andersson, Per Rune , et al
Albihns Göteborg AB Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
Former [2000/06]Mellul, Sylvie Lisette
L'Air Liquide, Service Propriété Industrielle, 75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date98402010.706.08.1998
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978584
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978584
Date:29.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:D06M10/02, D06M10/06, A61F13/15, D06M11/77
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:Faserstruktur und damit hergestellter absorbierender Artikel[2000/06]
English:Fibrous structure and absorbent article including such a fibrous structure[2000/06]
French:Structure fibreuse et article absorbant le contenant[2000/06]
Examination procedure09.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
06.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.02.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2009Fee for grant paid
15.06.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.05.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
18.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
22.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
24.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
20.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
19.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.07.2009
BE29.07.2009
CY29.07.2009
DK29.07.2009
FI29.07.2009
IT29.07.2009
NL29.07.2009
SE29.07.2009
IE06.08.2009
LU06.08.2009
CH31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
FR29.09.2009
GR30.10.2009
ES09.11.2009
PT29.11.2009
[2011/45]
Former [2011/35]AT29.07.2009
BE29.07.2009
DK29.07.2009
FI29.07.2009
IT29.07.2009
NL29.07.2009
SE29.07.2009
IE06.08.2009
LU06.08.2009
CH31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
FR29.09.2009
GR30.10.2009
ES09.11.2009
PT29.11.2009
Former [2011/25]AT29.07.2009
BE29.07.2009
DK29.07.2009
FI29.07.2009
IT29.07.2009
NL29.07.2009
SE29.07.2009
IE06.08.2009
LU06.08.2009
CH31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
GR30.10.2009
ES09.11.2009
PT29.11.2009
Former [2010/44]AT29.07.2009
BE29.07.2009
DK29.07.2009
FI29.07.2009
NL29.07.2009
SE29.07.2009
IE06.08.2009
CH31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
ES09.11.2009
PT29.11.2009
Former [2010/28]AT29.07.2009
BE29.07.2009
DK29.07.2009
FI29.07.2009
NL29.07.2009
SE29.07.2009
CH31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
ES09.11.2009
PT29.11.2009
Former [2010/19]AT29.07.2009
FI29.07.2009
NL29.07.2009
SE29.07.2009
MC31.08.2009
ES09.11.2009
PT29.11.2009
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0524529  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,8,17 * the whole document * [A] 7;
 [DX]US5576076  (SLOOTMAN FRANK [FR], et al) [DX] 1-9,17 * column 1, line 8 - line 35 * * column 3, line 24 - line 36 *;
 [X]JPH05156055  ;
 [X]WO9203591  (SOMMER SA [FR]) [X] 1-6,9,17 * page 11, line 4 - line 30; example -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0311989  (DYNEEMA VOF [NL]) [A] 1-9,17 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH01192871  ;
 [A]EP0483859  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 29, Database accession no. 93-232467, XP002089973 & JPH05156055 A 19930622 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [X] 1,2,8,9 * abstract *
 [X]  - SARMADI M ET AL, "IMPROVED DYEING PROPERTIES OF SICI4 (ST)-PLASMA TREATED POLYESTER FABRICS", TEXTILE CHEMIST AND COLORIST, (19960601), vol. 28, no. 6, pages 17 - 22, XP000593663 [X] 1,2,8,17 * the whole document *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 37, Database accession no. 89-266770, XP002089974 & JPH01192871 A 19890802 (KURARAY CO LTD) [A] 10-16 * abstract *