Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0899870

EP0899870 - Apparatus and method for pre-distortion correction of a power amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.11.2002
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn 
22.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.01.2003  [2003/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HARRIS CORPORATION
1025 West Nasa Blvd
Melbourne, FL 32919 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/09]For all designated states
HARRIS CORPORATION
1025 West NASA Blvd
Melbourne, FL 32919 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Danielsons, David
508 North Fift
Hannibal, MO 63401 / US
02 / Merideth, Bruce
RR1 Box 111
Mendon, IL 62351 / US
[1999/09]
Representative(s)Kopacz, William James
Law Offices Kopacz
129 Boulevard Saint-Germain
75006 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/09]Kopacz, William James
83, Avenue Foch
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98402075.018.08.1998
[1999/09]
Priority number, dateUS19970057096P27.08.1997         Original published format: US 57096 P
[1999/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0899870
Date:03.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:H03F1/32
[1999/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1999/46]
Former [1999/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gerät und Verfahren zur Vorverzerrungskorrektur eines Leistungsverstärkers[1999/09]
English:Apparatus and method for pre-distortion correction of a power amplifier[1999/09]
French:Dispositif et méthode pour la correction de prédistorsion d'un amplificateur de puissance[1999/09]
Examination procedure29.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/09]
01.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/02]
17.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5191338  (MOOCHALLA SHABBIR S ET AL) [Y] 1-3,6 * page 11, line 19 - page 13, line 29; figures 13,14 *;
 [A]EP0784379  (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-3,5 * column 4, line 39 - column 9, line 30; figures 4-13 *;
 [A]US5528532  (SHIBUTANI MOTOYUKI) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [Y]  - BELLIS M, "AN ENERGY EFFICIENT UHF POWER AMPLIFIER FOR EXISTING AND PROPOSED TRANSMISSION SYSTEMS", BROADCAST SESSIONS, MONTREUX, JUNE 10 - 15, 1993, POSTES;TELEPHONES ET TELEGRAPHES SUISSES, (19930610), no. SYMP. 1993, pages 739 - 747, XP000385327 [Y] 1-3,6 * page 739 - page 747; figures 1-4 *
 [A]  - H. IGARASHI M. NIWA H. ASHIDA, "GaAs Fet Power Amplifier for 6 GHz SSB Radio", IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, Atlanta, Georgia, (19841126), vol. 3/3, pages 1246 - 1252, XP002085728 [A] 7-11 * page 1246 - page 1247; figures 1,5 *