Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990864

EP0990864 - Process and apparatus for treating flue gases [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.09.2002
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.11.2002  [2002/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lambert, Serge
11 rue de la Grande Trouée
77640 Jouarre / FR
For all designated states
Flour, Jean-Pierre
3 Rond-Point Stalingrad
77290 Mitry-Mory / FR
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Robert, Jean-Pierre , et al
Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric
75017 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Robert, Jean-Pierre , et al
CABINET BOETTCHER, 22, rue du Général Foy
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98402416.601.10.1998
[2000/14]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990864
Date:05.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:F25J1/02
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/50]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von Rauchgasen[2000/14]
English:Process and apparatus for treating flue gases[2000/14]
French:Procédé et dispositif de traitement des fumées[2000/14]
Examination procedure21.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
06.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.01.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, FR, MC
01.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/45]
05.06.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
07.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200003   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.2001
31.10.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2536874  (HITACHI LTD);
 [A]JPH01290512  ;
 [A]JPS5223567  ;
 [A]DE4200990  (LINDE AG [DE]);
 [A]DE3138861  (BASF AG [DE]);
 [E]FR2761761  (LAMBERT SERGE [FR]) [E] 1-14 * figure -; claim - *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900208), vol. 014, no. 068, Database accession no. (C - 0686), & JP01290512 A 19891122 (KYODO SANSO KK) [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 77, no. 14, Database accession no. 77-24259Y, XP002093851 & JPS5223567 A 19770222 (HITACHI SHIP & ENG CO LTD) [A] * abstract *