Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992916

EP0992916 - Digital signal processor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.09.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.11.2004  [2004/45]
Applicant(s)For:DE  FI  GB  SE 
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC.
13500 North Central Expressway Dallas
Texas 75243 / US
For:FR 
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE
821, avenue Jack Kilby, B.P. 5
06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cédex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/08]For:DE  FI  GB  SE 
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC.
13500 North Central Expressway
Dallas, Texas 75243 / US
For:FR 
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE
821, avenue Jack Kilby, B.P. 5
06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cédex / FR
Former [2000/15]For:DE  SE  AT  BE  CH  LI  DK  ES  FI  GB  GR  IE  IT  LU  MC  NL  PT  CY 
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC.
13500 North Central Expressway
Dallas, Texas 75243 / US
For:FR 
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE
821, avenue Jack Kilby, B.P. 5
06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Laurenti, Gilbert
1490 Chemin de Saint Etienne
06570 Saint Paul de Vence / FR
02 / Djafarian, Karim
453 Boulevard de la reine jeanne
Les Toscannes Batiment B1 06140 Vence / FR
03 / Ponsot, Eric
L'Eden de Lacoste 347 route de Cagnes
06140 VENCE / FR
04 / Boyadjian, Alain
410 Chemain du puissanton Residence MediterraneeB3
06220 Vallauris / FR
05 / Gillet, Vincent
6 chemin des Moutins
06650 le Rouret / FR
06 / Gicalone, jean-pierre
484 chemin des Ecoliers
06140 VENCE / FR
07 / Bachot, Jean-Marc
Le reve d'Azur 33 chemin de Garagai
06130 Plascassier / FR
08 / Badi, Eric
11 Avenue des Pignatieres Le concorde
06700 Saint Laurent du Var / FR
09 / Catan, Herve
1050 Corniche Fahnestock
06700 Saint Laurent du Var / FR
10 / Laine, Armelle
13 Rue Aubernon
06600 Antibes / FR
11 / Couvrat, Marc
1697 Avenue des plateaux Fleuris
06700 Saint Laurent du Var / FR
12 / Ego, Emannuel
Le Mas des Micocouliers A1 36 Vieux chemin
De Saint Laurent 06600 Antibes / FR
13 / Ganesh, N.M
81a Perumal Sannadhi Str
Tirunelveli 627001 / IN
14 / Clave, Gael
Chemin des Moyennes Breguieres
Residence Aurelia 06600 Antibes / FR
15 / Lombardot, Anne
1159 chemin de Jr Jeaume
06740 Chateau neuf de Grasse / FR
16 / Masse, Yves
370 chemin de Saint Julien
06410 Biot / FR
17 / Nidegger, Frederic
1 Avenue Jean Marlin
06300 Nice / FR
18 / Tardieux, Jean-louis
Avenue de Cannes Domaine du Loup, Verdon B
06800 Cagnes-sur-Mer / FR
19 / Theodorou, Francois
163 Avenue de Nice
06800 Cagnes-sur-Mer / FR
20 / Tokyo-To Suginami-Ku
Naritahigashi 3-19-30
Suginami-Ku, Tokyo 166-0015 / JP
21 / Russell, David
Spinfield Lane
Marlow Bucks SL7 2JN / GB
22 / Buser, Mark
329 Dewey Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15218 / US
23 / Deao, Douglas.E
4574 Sheraton Circle
Brookshire, Texas 77423 / US
24 / Ichard, Laurent
55 Avenue de Cannes Les pins Bleu-Batiment C
06160 Juan les Pins / FR
25 / Jackson, Walter.A
1006 Mirror Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15218 / US
26 / Rosenzweig, Jack
1210 Macon Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15218 / US
[2000/29]
Former [2000/23]01 / Laurenti, Gilbert
1490 Chemin de Saint Etienne
06570 Saint Paul de Vence / FR
02 / Djafarian, Karim
453 Boulevard de la reine jeanne
Les Toscannes Batiment B1 06140 Vence / FR
03 / Ponsot, Eric
L'Eden de Lacoste 347 route de Cagnes
06140 VENCE / FR
04 / Boyadjian, Alain
410 Chemain du puissanton Residence MediterraneeB3
06220 Vallauris / FR
05 / Gillet, Vincent
6 chemin des Moutins
06650 le Rouret / FR
06 / Gicalone, jean-pierre
484 chemin des Ecoliers
06140 VENCE / FR
07 / Bachot, Jean-Marc
Le reve d'Azur 33 chemin de Garagai
06130 Plascassier / FR
08 / Badi, Eric
11 Avenue des Pignatieres Le concorde
06700 Saint Laurent du Var / FR
09 / Catan, Herve
1050 Corniche Fahnestock
06700 Saint Laurent du Var / FR
10 / Laine, Armelle
13 Rue Aubernon
06600 Antibes / FR
11 / Couvrat, Marc
1697 Avenue des plateaux Fleuris
06700 Saint Laurent du Var / FR
12 / Ego, Emannuel
Le Mas des Micocouliers A1 36 Vieux chemin
De Saint Laurent 06600 Antibes / FR
13 / Ganesh, N.M
81a Perumal Sannadhi Str
Tirunelveli 627001 / IN
14 / Clave, Gael
Chemin des Moyennes Breguieres
Residence Aurelia 06600 Antibes / FR
15 / Lombardot, Anne
1159 chemin de Jr Jeaume
06740 Chateau neuf de Grasse / FR
16 / Masse, Yves
370 chemin de Saint Julien
06410 Biot / FR
17 / Nidegger, Frederic
1 Avenue Jean Marlin
06300 Nice / FR
18 / Tardieux, Jean-louis
Avenue de Cannes Domaine du Loup, Verdon B
06800 Cagnes-sur-Mer / FR
19 / Theodorou, Francois
163 Avenue de Nice
06800 Cagnes-sur-Mer / FR
20 / Abiko, Shigeshi
Kamiya 1-3-4-1111
Tokyo To Kita Ku TK 115 / JP
21 / Russell, David
Spinfield Lane
Marlow Bucks SL7 2JN / GB
22 / Buser, Mark
329 Dewey Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15218 / US
23 / Deao, Douglas.E
4574 Sheraton Circle
Brookshire, Texas 77423 / US
24 / Ichard, Laurent
55 Avenue de Cannes Les pins Bleu-Batiment C
06160 Juan les Pins / FR
25 / Jackson, Walter.A
1006 Mirror Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15218 / US
26 / Rosenzweig, Jack
1210 Macon Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15218 / US
Former [2000/15]01 / Laurenti, Gilbert
1490 Chemin de Saint Etienne
06570 Saint Paul de Vence / FR
02 / Djafarian, Karim
453 Boulevard de la reine jeanne
Les Toscannes Batiment B1 06140 Vence / FR
03 / Ponsot, Eric
L'Eden de Lacoste 347 route de Cagnes
06140 VENCE / FR
04 / Boyadjian, Alain
410 Chemain du puissanton Residence MediterraneeB3
06220 Vallauris / FR
05 / Gillet, Vincent
6 chemin des Moutins
06650 le Rouret / FR
06 / Gicalone, jean-pierre
484 chemin des Ecoliers
06140 VENCE / FR
07 / Bachot, Jean-Marc
Le reve d'Azur 33 chemin de Garagai
06130 Plascassier / FR
08 / Badi, Eric
11 Avenue des Pignatieres Le concorde
06700 Saint Laurent du Var / FR
09 / Catan, Herve
1050 Corniche Fahnestock
06700 Saint Laurent du Var / FR
10 / Laine, Armelle
13 Rue Aubernon
06600 Antibes / FR
11 / Couvrat, Marc
1697 Avenue des plateaux Fleuris
06700 Saint Laurent du Var / FR
12 / Ego, Emannuel
Le Mas des Micocouliers A1 36 Vieux chemin
De Saint Laurent 06600 Antibes / FR
13 / Ganesh, N.M
3430 Warburton Ave, #10
Santa Carla, CA 95051 / US
14 / Clave, Gael
Chemin des Moyennes Breguieres
Residence Aurelia 06600 Antibes / FR
15 / Lombardot, Anne
1159 chemin de Jr Jeaume
06740 Chateau neuf de Grasse / FR
16 / Masse, Yves
370 chemin de Saint Julien
06410 Biot / FR
17 / Nidegger, Frederic
1 Avenue Jean Marlin
06300 Nice / FR
18 / Tardieux, Jean-louis
Avenue de Cannes Domaine du Loup, Verdon B
06800 Cagnes-sur-Mer / FR
19 / Theodorou, Francois
163 Avenue de Nice
06800 Cagnes-sur-Mer / FR
20 / Abiko, Shigeshi
Kamiya 1-3-4-1111
Tokyo To Kita Ku TK 115 / JP
21 / Russell, David
Spinfield Lane
Marlow Bucks SL7 2JN / GB
22 / Buser, Mark
329 Dewey Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15218 / US
23 / Deao, Douglas.E
4574 Sheraton Circle
Brookshire, Texas 77423 / US
24 / Ichard, Laurent
55 Avenue de Cannes Les pins Bleu-Batiment C
06160 Juan les Pins / FR
25 / Jackson, Walter.A
1006 Mirror Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15218 / US
26 / Rosenzweig, Jack
1210 Macon Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15218 / US
Representative(s)Potter, Julian Mark , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London
EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Potter, Julian Mark , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date98402455.406.10.1998
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992916
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/78, G06F9/38
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   SE [2000/51]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Digitaler Signalprozessor[2000/15]
English:Digital signal processor[2000/15]
French:Processeur de signaux numériques[2000/15]
Examination procedure07.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
01.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/45]
07.06.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
08.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9835301  (CIRRUS LOGIC INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0840208  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5452401  (LIN CHONG M [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5732234  (VASSILIADIS STAMATIS [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5515530  (ESKANDARI NICK G [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - P. M. KOGGE, The Architecture of Pipelined Computers, NEW YORK, US, MCGRAW-HILL, (1981), 13286, XP002096561 [A] 1 * page 220, paragraph 3 - page 225, paragraph 2 *