blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0924902

EP0924902 - Network bandwidth control [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
4150 Network Circle
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/12]For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
4150 Network Circle
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
Former [2003/17]For all designated states
Sun Microsystems, Inc.
4150 Network Circle
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
Former [1999/25]For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
901 San Antonio Road
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Blanco, Marcos Ares
31 Rue General Ferrie
38000 Grenoble / FR
02 / Martin, Jean Christophe
Le Petit Rochefort, Route de Beauregard
38760 Varces / FR
[1999/27]
Former [1999/25]01 / Blanco, Marcos Ares
36, Rue Bizanet
38000 Grenoble / FR
02 / Martin, Jean Christophe
Le Petit Rochefort, Route de Beauregard
38760 Varces / FR
Representative(s)Harris, Ian Richard, et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/25]Harris, Ian Richard, et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date98402875.319.11.1998
[1999/25]
Priority number, dateUS1997099570722.12.1997         Original published format: US 995707
[1999/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0924902
Date:23.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0924902
Date:02.04.2003
[2003/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0924902
Date:22.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/12]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP0924902
Date:28.06.2006
[2006/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.02.2003
ClassificationIPC:H04L12/56, H04L29/06
[1999/25]
CPC:
H04L47/27 (EP,US); H04L47/10 (EP,US); H04L47/193 (EP,US);
H04L47/283 (EP,US); H04L69/163 (EP,US); H04L69/166 (EP,US);
H04L69/16 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/01]
Former [1999/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Netzwerkbandbreitensteuerung[1999/25]
English:Network bandwidth control[1999/25]
French:Commande de largeur de bande passante dans un réseau[1999/25]
Examination procedure02.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/36]
03.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.10.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
03.03.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) NL, SE
11.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.05.2005Fee for grant paid
17.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.11.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR22.03.2006
GB19.11.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2008/15]GB19.11.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0430571  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1,9,18 * page 3, line 57 - page 4, line 17 * * figure 7 ** claims 1,5,10 *;
 [A]EP0458033  (IBM [US]) [A] 1,9,18 * page 2, line 1 - page 2, line 7 * * page 3, line 56 - page 4, line 3 * * page 5, line 14 - page 5, line 18 * * page 5, line 44 - page 7, line 16 * * claims 1,7 *
ExaminationEP0430571
 EP0458033
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.