blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0864478

EP0864478 - Method for controlling railway vehicles, and also vehicle computer and vehicle control system therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  03.08.2007
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2007Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 05.09.2007  [2007/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54, rue la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2007/17]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54 rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Former [1999/08]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Former [1998/38]For all designated states
ALCATEL ALSTHOM COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'ELECTRICITE
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Uebel, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing.
Heckenweg 2/1
71229 Leonberg / DE
[1998/38]
Representative(s)Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte, et al
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Gropiusplatz 10
70563 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/45]Kohler Schmid Möbus, et al
Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1998/38]Schätzle, Albin, Dipl.-Phys., et al
Alcatel Alsthom Intellectual Property Department, Postfach 30 09 29
70449 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date98440042.403.03.1998
[1998/38]
Priority number, dateDE1997100855904.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19708559
[1998/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0864478
Date:16.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0864478
Date:17.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/38]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0864478
Date:05.09.2007
Language:DE
[2007/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.1998
ClassificationIPC:B61L27/04
[1998/38]
CPC:
B61L27/04 (EP); B61L2003/226 (EP); B61L2205/04 (EP);
B61L2210/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1999/21]
Former [1998/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Steuerung spurgebundener Fahrzeuge sowie Fahrzeugrechner und Fahrzeugsteuerungssystem hierfür[1998/38]
English:Method for controlling railway vehicles, and also vehicle computer and vehicle control system therefor[1998/38]
French:Procédé pour commander des véhicules sur rails ainsi qu'ordinateur pour véhicule et système de commande de véhicule pour ce procédé[1998/38]
Examination procedure25.07.1998Examination requested  [1998/39]
15.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
04.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.06.2003Fee for grant paid
16.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.06.2004  20.07.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsche Bahn AG
Potsdamer Platz 2
10785 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Zinken-Sommer, Rainer
Deutsche Bahn AG
HLM 4 - Patentabteilung
Richelstrasse 3
80634 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2006/45]
Opponent(s)01  17.06.2004  20.07.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsche Bahn AG
Potsdamer Platz 2
10785 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Zinken-Sommer, Rainer
Deutsche Bahn AG Patentabteilung Völckerstrasse 5
80939 München / DE
Former [2006/43]
Opponent(s)01  17.06.2004  20.07.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsche Bahn AG
Potsdamer Platz 2
10785 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Kohler Schmid Möbus
Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2004/33]
Opponent(s)01  17.06.2004    ADMISSIBLE
Deutsche Bahn AG
Potsdamer Platz 2
10785 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Zinken-Sommer, Rainer
Deutsche Bahn AG Patentabteilung Völckerstrasse 5
80393 München / DE
26.07.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.10.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.10.2004Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
28.12.2004Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
09.11.2006Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.11.2006Date of oral proceedings
19.12.2006Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.12.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.04.2007Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
12.07.2007Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE17.12.2003
ES28.12.2003
AT03.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
[2005/51]
Former [2005/21]SE17.12.2003
ES28.12.2003
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
Former [2005/14]SE17.12.2003
ES28.12.2003
BE31.03.2004
Former [2004/46]SE17.12.2003
ES28.12.2003
Former [2004/16]SE17.12.2003
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH08214415  ;
 [Y]DE3026652  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 4,8-10 * page 5 - page 7, line 28 * * page 10, line 31 - page 11, line 22; figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE4123632  (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0697580  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,6-9* the whole document *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 096, no. 012, & JP08214415 A 19960820 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-3,5-7 * abstract *
Opposition   - Dokumentation "Zugsicherungs-/Zugsteuerungssystem ETCS, Functional Requirements Specification" Teil B u. Teil E, Projekt DEUFRAKO-M, vom 31.8.1994
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.