Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0919153

EP0919153 - Protective case for keys [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.08.2001
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.10.2001 [2001/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ortiz Rilo, Carlos
Calle Afueras a Valverde & Numero 6, Piso 4o A
28034 Madrid / ES
[1999/22]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/22]
Application number, filing date98500070.217.03.1998
[1999/22]
Priority number, dateES1997000061120.03.1997         Original published format: ES 9700611
[1999/22]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0919153
Date:02.06.1999
Language:FR
[1999/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0919153
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:A45C11/32
[1999/22]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/39]
Former [1999/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schutzhülle für Schlüssel[1999/22]
English:Protective case for keys[1999/22]
French:Porte clefs protecteur[1999/22]
Examination procedure03.10.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/42]
04.05.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2001/42]
Public notificationsCONSTATATION DE LA PERTE D'UN DROIT (REGLE 69(1) CBE) 2524 22.12.00
Ortiz Rilo, Carlos
Calle Afueras a Valverde & Numero 6, Piso 4o A
28034 Madrid / ES
[2001/14]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.09.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
08.09.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200003   M06   Not yet paid
31.03.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US2623381  (QUEEN HAROLD E) [A] 1,2,6,7,9 * column W *;
 [A]US1779621  (MOORE HAL E) [A] 1,2,6,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3832874  (WILLIS R) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]US2243008  (JOHNSON LEONARD A) [A] 1 * the whole document *