Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0903458

EP0903458 - Retaining stop for doors and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 15.07.2009  [2009/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SAINT GENIS, S.A.
Carretera N-340, Km. 1240,4, Poligon Industrial Sector GRAB
08758 Cervello (Barcelona) / ES
[1999/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Sangenis Linan, Albert
Ctra. N-340, Km. 1240,4, Poligon Ind. Sector GRAB
08758 Cervell (Barcelona) / ES
02 / Valles Asensi, Joan
Ctra. N-340, Km. 1240,4, Poligon Ind. Sector GRAB
08758 Cervell (Barcelona) / ES
[1999/12]
Representative(s)Ponti Sales, Adelaida , et al
Oficina Ponti
C. Consell de Cent, 322
08007 Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Ponti Sales, Adelaida , et al
Oficina Ponti C. Consell de Cent 322
08007 Barcelona / ES
Former [1999/12]Ponti Sales, Adelaida , et al
C. Consell de Cent, 322
08007 Barcelona / ES
Application number, filing date98500200.508.09.1998
[1999/12]
Priority number, dateES1997000194917.09.1997         Original published format: ES 9701949
[1999/12]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0903458
Date:24.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0903458
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:E05C17/56
[1999/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/12]
Extension statesAL20.05.1999
LT20.05.1999
LV20.05.1999
MK20.05.1999
RO20.05.1999
SI20.05.1999
TitleGerman:Stopp- und Haltevorrichtung für Türen oder dergleichen[1999/12]
English:Retaining stop for doors and the like[1999/12]
French:Dispositif d'arrêt et de retenue pour portes ou similaires[1999/12]
Examination procedure20.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/29]
11.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2002Fee for grant paid
12.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.09.2002
CH25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
LI25.09.2002
DK25.12.2002
[2007/17]
Former [2005/21]AT25.09.2002
CH25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
LI25.09.2002
Former [2003/39]AT25.09.2002
CH25.09.2002
LI25.09.2002
Former [2003/31]AT25.09.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]US3578370  (GREYTOK JAMES J) [A] 1,3,5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2497697  (SMITH MERRILL H) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5010622  (MORITA TAMAO [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1-22 *
by applicantES260402