Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978473

EP0978473 - Automatic braking system for reversible transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.01.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.03.2003  [2003/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cunat Martinez, Vicente
Ildefonso Carrascosa, 12, Polg. Inds del Mediterràneo
46560 Masalfasar (Valencia) / ES
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter
Flaccus Müller-Wolff
Patentanwälte
Bussardweg 10
50389 Wesseling / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, Dr.
Patentanwalt Bussardweg 10
50389 Wesseling / DE
Application number, filing date98500222.909.10.1998
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateES1998000168105.08.1998         Original published format: ES 9801681
[2000/06]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978473
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B66D5/14, F16D59/02
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/42]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Automatisches Bremssystem für reversierbares Getriebe[2000/06]
English:Automatic braking system for reversible transmission[2000/06]
French:Système de freinage automatique pour une transmission réversible[2000/06]
Examination procedure13.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
03.06.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
21.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.06.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
18.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/11]
27.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US2408179  (SCHUETZ THOMAS J, et al) [A] 1 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US1892940  (ERDAHL NICHOLAI M) [A] 1 * figures 2,3 *