Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0921039

EP0921039 - Internal trim for doors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 21.01.2004  [2004/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GRUPO ANTOLIN-INGENIERIA, S.A.
Crta. Madrid Irun, Km. 244,8
09080 Burgos / ES
[1999/41]
Former [1999/23]For all designated states
IRAUSA INGENIERIA, S.A.
Carretera Madrid-Irun, Km. 244,8
E-09007 Burgos / ES
Inventor(s)01 / Manso Moneo, Alberto
10 Gral. Yagüe St.
09004 Burgos / ES
[1999/23]
Representative(s)Urteaga Simarro, José Antonio
URTEAGA Patentes y Marcas
C/Principe de Vergara, 31
28001 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [1999/23]Urteaga Simarro, José Antonio
Principe de Vergara, 31
28001 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date98500262.503.12.1998
[1999/23]
Priority number, dateES1997000251003.12.1997         Original published format: ES 9702510
[1999/23]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0921039
Date:09.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0921039
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60R13/02
[1999/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/08]
Former [1999/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Paneel für Türinnenverkleidung[1999/23]
English:Internal trim for doors[1999/23]
French:Panneau de garnissage intérieur pour portes[1999/23]
Examination procedure09.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
26.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2002Fee for grant paid
21.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200003   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2001
31.12.200104   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES29.05.2003
[2004/04]
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4433426  (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE4433427  (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-10 *;
 [A]US5456513  (SCHMIDT GLEN D [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5224299  (ABE NOBUO [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2141472  (TORNADO MODEL PRODUCTS LIMITED) [A] 1 * the whole document *