Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969441

EP0969441 - Rotary driven poster, to be used with advertising, informative ends and other uses [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.04.2001 [2001/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Diaz, Hugo Roberto
San Martin 686 - 7o piso - of. 72
1004 Buenos Aires / AR
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Urizar Anasagasti, José Antonio
Uryas
Victor de la Serna 3-5 (parking)
28016 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Urizar Anasagasti, José Antonio
Puerto Rico 6A, Bajo
28016 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date98500284.930.12.1998
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateUS1998010837401.07.1998         Original published format: US 108374
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969441
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G09F15/00, G09F11/02, G09F7/22
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   NL,   PT [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Drehscheibe für Reklame, Anzeigen und andere Zwecke[2000/01]
English:Rotary driven poster, to be used with advertising, informative ends and other uses[2000/01]
French:Panneau de commande rotative, employable à des fins publicitaires, d'information et d'autres usages[2000/01]
Examination procedure06.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/14]
08.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/14]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
24.08.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]GB213529  (CHRISTIAN GLEERUP MOELLER) [A] 1-5,9-14,17 * page 1, column R, line 66 - line 85; figures 1,4; claim 2 *;
 [A]FR2731057  (VANCAYZEELE GUY LUCIEN HENRI [FR]) [A] 1-4 * page 3, line 5 - line 8; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5054219  (HOYT WILBER S [US], et al) [A] 1-5,9-14,17 * column 3, line 12 - line 20 * * column 3, line 46 - line 54 * * figures 5,6 *;
 [A]FR2158821  (FERREIRA PINTO LUIS) [A] 9-15,17,18 * figures 1-6; claims 6,10 *