Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0997413

EP0997413 - A process and a plant for manufacturing disposable wash cloths and wash cloths [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.10.2004
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.11.2004  [2004/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
B6 A/S
Tranäsvej 33, Postboks 29
9300 Saeby / DK
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
B6 A/S
Tranäsvej 33, Postboks 29
9300 Saeby / DK
Inventor(s)01 / Ove, Fabricius
Osterallé 64
9300 Saeby / DK
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Nielsen, Leif , et al
Patrade A/S
Ceresbyen 75
8000 Aarhus C / DK
[N/P]
Former [2003/46]Nielsen, Leif , et al
Patrade A/S Fredens Torv 3A
8000 Aarhus C / DK
Former [2000/18]Pedersen, Soeren Skovgaard , et al
Hofman-Bang & Boutard, Lehmann & Ree A/S Ryesgade 3 P.O. Box 367
8100 Aarhus C / DK
Application number, filing date98610032.902.09.1998
[2000/18]
Filing languageDA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0997413
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0997413
Date:26.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:B65H18/14, B65H35/02, B65H18/20, B29C44/56
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   LI,   NL,   SE [2001/02]
Former [2000/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Wegwerfreinigungstüchern und so hergestellte Reinigungstücher[2000/18]
English:A process and a plant for manufacturing disposable wash cloths and wash cloths[2000/18]
French:Procédé et installation pour la fabrication de tissus de nettoyage à jeter et tissus de nettoyage ainsi obtenus[2000/18]
Examination procedure01.11.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
04.11.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
20.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, GR, IT, LU, MC, PT
19.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2003Fee for grant paid
03.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
25.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.12.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
13.12.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
13.12.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
13.12.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
13.12.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
13.12.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US3944150  (JENNERJAHN BRIAN M) [A] 1,5 * column 1, line 6 - column 3, line 1; figure - *;
 [A]EP0842881  (FORT JAMES CORP [US]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2819919  (UNIFOAM AG) [A] 1,2 * page 12 *