blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0992263


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.03.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.04.2008  [2008/15]
23.03.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.04.2007  [2007/17]
17.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
10.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2006  [2006/13]
03.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2006  [2006/12]
04.11.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2005  [2005/51]
23.09.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.11.2005  [2005/45]
22.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2005  [2005/23]
22.04.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  08.06.2005  [2005/23]
15.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2005  [2005/22]
25.03.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.05.2005  [2005/19]
24.12.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.02.2005  [2005/06]
26.11.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.01.2005  [2005/02]
05.11.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.12.2004  [2004/52]
30.04.2004 (Expected) grant published on  16.06.2004  [2004/25]
26.04.2004 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
26.04.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
26.04.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
26.04.2004 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
22.04.2004 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
21.02.2004 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
03.10.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.07.2003 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.06.2003 Change - German title published on  30.07.2003  [2003/31]
17.01.2003 Examination report or reply
09.10.2002 Renewal fee
13.09.2002 First examination report
12.09.2002 Examination report or reply
27.09.2001 Renewal fee
02.01.2001 Change - extension states
03.11.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  20.12.2000 [2000/51]
21.10.2000 Request for examination filed published on  06.12.2000 [2000/49]
25.09.2000 Renewal fee
25.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]