blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0992263
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0992263Global Dossier 16.06.2004B1
EP0992263 12.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP98630059 09.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT269131T 15.07.2004T
Priority number Date
EP98630059 09.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE59811585D 22.07.2004D1
Priority number Date
EP98630059 09.10.1998