Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992263

EP0992263 - Supporting device for inline skates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2005
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Richter, Holger
16, rue Antoine Meyer
2153 Luxemburg / LU
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Waxweiler, Jean , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Waxweiler, Jean , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
Application number, filing date98630059.809.10.1998
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992263
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992263
Date:16.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:A63C17/00, A63C3/00
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:Haltevorrichtung für Inline-Skates[2003/31]
English:Supporting device for inline skates[2000/15]
French:Support pour patins à roulettes alignées[2000/15]
Former [2000/15]Haltevorrichtung für inline-skates
Examination procedure06.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
16.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
16.04.2004Fee for grant paid
16.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23]
Request for further processing for:16.04.2004Request for further processing filed
16.04.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.04.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
FR16.06.2004
GB16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
IT16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
AT09.10.2004
LU09.10.2004
BE31.10.2004
CH31.10.2004
LI31.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
PT16.11.2004
[2008/15]
Former [2007/17]CY16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
FR16.06.2004
GB16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
AT09.10.2004
LU09.10.2004
BE31.10.2004
CH31.10.2004
LI31.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2006/14]FI16.06.2004
FR16.06.2004
GB16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
AT09.10.2004
BE31.10.2004
CH31.10.2004
LI31.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2006/13]FI16.06.2004
GB16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
AT09.10.2004
BE31.10.2004
CH31.10.2004
LI31.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2006/12]FI16.06.2004
GB16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
BE31.10.2004
CH31.10.2004
LI31.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/51]FI16.06.2004
GB16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
BE31.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/45]FI16.06.2004
GB16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/23]FI16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
Former [2005/22]FI16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/19]FI16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/06]FI16.06.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/02]FI16.06.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2004/52]SE16.09.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]US5269580  (HSIAO LOUIS [US]) [A] 1-6,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5547157  (HSIAO LOUIS [US]) [A] 1,3-6,8,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4269337  (SOBOTKA FRANK) [A] 1,7,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4326746  (GRIHALVA LAWRENCE A) [A] 1,7,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5301818  (DIX KEVIN M [US]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *