Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0887758

EP0887758 - System for managing accounting information in a multi-dimensional database [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.05.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.07.2004  [2004/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hyperion Solutions Corporation
1344 Crossman Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
[2002/28]
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
Hyperion Software Operations Inc.
900 Long Ridge Road, Stamford
Connecticut 06902 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Pinard, Jeffrey S.
2437 Bedford Street, Apt. C12
Stamford, Connecticut 06905 / US
02 / Kemper, Katheryn
32 Tannery Lane South
Weston Connecticut 06883 / US
[1999/15]
Former [1999/01]01 / Pinard, Jeffrey S.
2437 Bedford Street, Apt. C12
Stamford, Connecticut 06905 / US
Representative(s)McCarthy, Denis Alexis , et al
MacLachlan & Donaldson
Unit 10, 4075 Kingswood Road
Citywest Business Campus
Dublin D24 C56E / IE
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]McCarthy, Denis Alexis , et al
MacLachlan & Donaldson 47 Merrion Square
Dublin 2 / IE
Application number, filing date98650037.922.06.1998
[1999/01]
Priority number, datedeleted
[2000/25]
Former [1999/01]US1997005103927.06.1997
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0887758
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/53]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0887758
Date:02.02.2000
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[1999/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/01]
TitleGerman:System zur Verwaltung von Buchführungsinformationen in einer mehrdimensionalen Datenbank[1999/01]
English:System for managing accounting information in a multi-dimensional database[1999/01]
French:Système de gestion des informations de comptabilisation dans un base de données à plusieurs dimensions[1999/01]
Examination procedure17.04.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
03.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/28]
04.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
19.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9634472  (WINDSTAR TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] * page 16, line 6 - line 23 *;
 [PA]US5719826  (LIPS MICHAEL D [US]) [PA] * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 4 * * column 22, line 55 - column 25, line 56 *
 [A]  "ERA DATE SUPPORT FOR SINGLE AND MULTIPLE CALENDAR CULTURES", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Armonk, NY, US, (199202), vol. 34, no. 9, pages 33 - 37, XP000300586 [A] * the whole document *
 [A]  "DATE INPUT AUTOMATICALLY CONVERTED TO SCIENTIFIC TIME", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Amonk, NY, US, (199003), vol. 32, no. 10B, page 343, XP000097909 [A] * the whole document *