Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0917141

EP0917141 - Disk drive for rotating removable media-type disks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.03.2001
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.04.2001 [2001/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Caleb Technology Corporation
4775 Walnut Street, Suite 1B Boulder
Colorado 80301 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/20]For all designated states
Caleb Technology Corporation
4775 Walnut Street, Suite 1B
Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Parsons, James H.
828 North Highway 287
Berthoud, Colorado 80513 / US
02 / Wadsworth, Edwin J.
1262 Milner Lane
Longmont, Colorado 80503 / US
03 / Banks, Christopher F.
725 James Canyon Drive
Boulder, Colorado 80503 / US
04 / Lee, Lane W.
894 South Bermont Drive
Lafayette, Colorado 80026 / US
[1999/20]
Representative(s)McKeown, Yvonne Mary , et al
MacLachlan & Donaldson
2B Clonskeagh Square
Clonskeagh Road
Dublin 14 / IE
[N/P]
Former [1999/20]McKeown, Yvonne Mary , et al
c/o MacLachlan & Donaldson, 47 Merrion Square
Dublin 2 / IE
Application number, filing date98650074.212.11.1998
[1999/20]
Priority number, dateUS1997097046914.11.1997         Original published format: US 970469
[1999/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0917141
Date:19.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0917141
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G11B17/04, G11B23/03
[1999/30]
Former International [1999/20]G11B17/04
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/40]
Former [1999/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Laufwerk für rotierende auswechselbare Platten[1999/20]
English:Disk drive for rotating removable media-type disks[1999/20]
French:Dispositif d'entrainement pour disques rotatifs amovibles[1999/20]
Examination procedure17.05.1999Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/16]
15.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/16]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
07.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
07.09.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5623381  (SAWADA TORU ET AL) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 5, line 5 - column 6, line 59 * * column 9, line 28 - column 10, line 22 * * column 4, line 7 - line 23 * [A] 3-6,12;
 [XA]US5583716  (AKIBA TAKAO ET AL) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 20 * * column 8, line 15 - column 9, line 57 * [A] 12;
 [YA]US5214550  (CHAN JOHN R) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * column 8, line 39 - column 10, line 12 * [A] 12;
 [YA]US5532994  (INOUE KAZUHIKO ET AL) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 13 - line 33 * [A] 12;
 [XA]EP0192095  (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 38 * * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 17 * * page 8, line 32 - line 36 * [A] 3-6,12;
 [A]JPH06267172
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941222), vol. 018, no. 685, Database accession no. (P - 1848), & JP06267172 A 19940922 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1-6,12 * abstract *