Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0887381

EP0887381 - Process for preparing propylene polymers and impact modified polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.09.2006
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Borealis Technology Oy
P.O. Box 330
06101 Porvoo / FI
[2005/45]
Former [2001/05]For all designated states
Borealis Technology Oy
P.O.Box 330
06101 Porvoo / FI
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
BOREALIS A/S
Lyngby Hovedgade 96
2800 Lyngby / DK
Inventor(s)01 / Harlin, Ali
Kärppärinne 1
01450 Vantaa / FI
02 / Alastalo, Kauno
Karjapolku 4
06400 Porvoo / FI
03 / Kivelä, Jouni
Sturenkatu 31 - 41 A 3
00550 Helsinki / FI
04 / Korhonen, Esa
Keinupolku 2 E 19
06400 Porvoo / FI
[1999/01]
Representative(s)Sundman, Patrik Christoffer , et al
Seppo Laine Oy
Itämerenkatu 3 B
00180 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]Sundman, Christoffer , et al
Seppo Laine Oy, Itämerenkatu 3 B
00180 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date98660063.324.06.1998
[1999/01]
Priority number, dateFI1997000272824.06.1997         Original published format: FI 972728
[1999/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0887381
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/53]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0887381
Date:09.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/16, C08F10/06, C08F2/00, B01J8/26, B01J19/24
[1999/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/36]
Former [1999/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Propylen Polymeren und schlagzäh modifizierten Polymeren[1999/01]
English:Process for preparing propylene polymers and impact modified polymers[1999/01]
French:Procédé de préparation d' homopolymères de propylène et de polymères modifiés résistant aux chocs[1999/01]
Examination procedure30.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/26]
02.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.2003Fee for grant paid
01.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42]
Request for further processing for:17.04.2002Request for further processing filed
17.04.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.04.2002Decision despatched
02.10.2000Request for further processing filed
02.10.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
31.10.2000Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
01.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
13.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.11.2005
CH09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
LI09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
PT10.04.2006
LU24.06.2006
IE26.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
[2008/36]
Former [2007/29]AT09.11.2005
CH09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
LI09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
PT10.04.2006
IE26.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
Former [2007/07]AT09.11.2005
CH09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
LI09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
PT10.04.2006
MC30.06.2006
Former [2006/49]AT09.11.2005
CH09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
LI09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
PT10.04.2006
Former [2006/38]AT09.11.2005
CH09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
LI09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
Former [2006/34]AT09.11.2005
CH09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
LI09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
Former [2006/33]CH09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
LI09.11.2005
SE09.02.2006
Former [2006/27]FI09.11.2005
SE09.02.2006
Former [2006/24]FI09.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[DX]US4740550  (FOSTER E GORDON) [DX] 1-5,8-10,13-15,23-32 * the whole document * * column 2, line 37 - line 39 * * column 3, line 31 - line 35 *;
 [X]US4740551  (FOSTER E GORDON) [X] 1-4,8-10,13-15,23-32 * column 8, line 7 - line 8 * * the whole document *;
 [DX]WO8802376  (UNION CARBIDE CORP) [DX] 1-5,8-10,13-15,23-32 * page 7, line 30 - page 11, line 21 * * example -; claim - *;
 [AX]EP0517183  (HIMONT INC ;MONTECATINI TECNOLOGIE SRL (IT)) [A] 1-28 * figure .; example - * [X] 29-32;
 [A]WO9703124  (ASUMALATHI MARKKU ;AEAERILAE JARI (FI); BOREALIS POLYMERS OY (FI);) [A] 1-32 * page 3, line 31 - page 5, line 24 * * page 6, line 18 - line 21 * * example - *;
 [X]WO9618662  (BOREALIS POLYMERS OY) [X] 29-32 * figure . *