Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0931523

EP0931523 - System having an artificial joint component and an instrument for handling the artificial joint component [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/30]Instrument for handling an artificial joint component
[2002/50]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Centerpulse Orthopedics Ltd.
Altgasse 44
6340 Baar / CH
[2003/17]
Former [1999/30]For all designated states
Sulzer Orthopädie AG
Grabenstrasse 25
6340 Baar / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Willi, Thomas
Grünmattstrasse 20
8405 Winterthur / CH
02 / Wymann, Burkhard
Ettenbühlstrasse 11
8353 Elgg / CH
[1999/30]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2002/09]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Gbr
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [1999/30]Sulzer Management AG
KS / Patente / 0007, Zürcherstrasse 12
8401 Winterthur / CH
Application number, filing date98810030.122.01.1998
[1999/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0931523
Date:28.07.1999
Language:DE
[1999/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0931523
Date:25.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/46
[1999/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   IT,   LI [2000/14]
Former [1999/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:System aus einer künstlichen Gelenkkomponente und einem Instrument zur Handhabung der künstlichen Gelenkkomponente[2002/50]
English:System having an artificial joint component and an instrument for handling the artificial joint component[2002/50]
French:Système comportant un élément articulaire artificiel et un instrument pour la manutention du élément articulaire artificiel[2002/50]
Former [1999/30]Instrument zur Handhabung einer künstlichen Gelenkkomponente
Former [1999/30]Instrument for handling an artificial joint component
Former [1999/30]Instrument pour la manutention d'un élément articulaire artificiel
Examination procedure24.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
29.01.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.05.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
15.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.04.2003Fee for grant paid
14.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.03.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR2710522  (DEUX C T [FR]) [Y] 1-3,8,9 * page 3, line 16 - line 19; figure 4 *;
 [Y]EP0190982  (TORNIER SA [FR]) [Y] 1-3,8,9 * figures 2-5 *;
 [A]EP0453694  (HIGH TECH IND H T I SOCIETE AN [FR]) [A] 1-9 * column 9, line 34 - column 13, line 10; figures 8-11 *;
 [A]GB2299758  (FINSBURY [GB]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]SU1680149  (DZHABBARLY CHINGIZ R [SU], et al) [A] 1 * figures 5,7 *;
 [A]US5540697  (REHMANN MARK L [US], et al);
 [A]WO9421199  (HOWMEDICA [US]);
 [A]WO9742915  (LINK WALDEMAR GMBH CO [DE], et al)