blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0877156

EP0877156 - Method and device to vaporize liquid fuel for use in a gas turbine combustor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.04.2007
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip06.04.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.05.2007  [2007/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALSTOM Technology Ltd
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
[N/P]
Former [2006/22]For all designated states
Alstom Technology Ltd
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
Former [2004/14]For all designated states
ALSTOM Technology Ltd
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
ALSTOM (Switzerland) Ltd
CHSP Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5401 Baden / CH
Former [2002/01]For all designated states
Alstom
25, Avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Former [1998/46]For all designated states
ABB RESEARCH LTD.
Affolternstrasse 52
8050 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Döbbeling, Klaus, Dr.
Schachenweg 6
5210 Windisch / CH
02 / Reh, Lothar, Prof. Dr.
Unterdorfstrasse 38
8126 Zumikon / CH
03 / Wang, Yunhogn
Hadlaubsteig 8
8006 Zürich / CH
[1998/46]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[2002/48]
Former [2002/01]Liebe, Rainer, et al
ALSTOM (Switzerland)Ltd CHSP Intellectual Property Haselstrasse 16/699/5.OG
5401 Baden / CH
Former [1998/46]Liebe, Rainer, et al
Asea Brown Boveri AG, Immaterialgüterrecht(TEI), Haselstrasse 16/699 I
5401 Baden / CH
Application number, filing date98810290.106.04.1998
[1998/46]
Priority number, dateDE199711919709.05.1997         Original published format: DE 19719197
[1998/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0877156
Date:11.11.1998
Language:DE
[1998/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0877156
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0877156
Date:31.05.2006
Language:DE
[2006/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:F02C7/224, F02C3/28, F23R3/30, F23R3/36
[2000/04]
CPC:
F02C3/20 (EP,US); F02C3/30 (EP,US); F02C7/224 (EP,US);
F23R3/30 (EP,US); F23D2204/10 (EP,US); Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1998/46]F02C7/224, F02C3/28, F23R3/30
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   GB,   LI [2000/39]
Former [1998/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Betreiben der Brennkammer einer Gasturbinenanlage mit Flüssigbrennstoff[1998/46]
English:Method and device to vaporize liquid fuel for use in a gas turbine combustor[1998/46]
French:Méthode et dispositif de vaporisation de carburant liquide pour son utilisation dans la chambre de combustion d'une turbine à gaz[1998/46]
Examination procedure13.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
12.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
07.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2006Fee for grant paid
22.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19]
Request for further processing for:07.04.2004Request for further processing filed
07.04.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.04.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
11.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2542953  (WILLIAMS JR LYNN A) [A] 1-20 * figure - *;
 [A]US2792058  (ALUN THOMAS, et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR1141270  (ARMSTRONG SIDDELEY MOTORS LTD) [A] 1-20* figure - *;
 [A]US4025282  (REED ROBERT D, et al) [A] 1,11 * abstract *;
 [X]US4838029  (GLEASON CLIFFORD C [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0691512  (MOWILL ROLF JAN [NL]) [X] 1-4,6,11 * abstract *
by applicantEP0321809
    - FÖRSTER S., "UMWELTFREUNDLICHER ÖLDAMPF-MOTOR", BERICHTE DES FORSCHUNGSZENTRUMS JÜLICH, pages 1 - 4
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.