Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0960831

EP0960831 - Package comprising a coupon and process for obtaining said package [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.09.2002
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GR
published on 26.08.2015  [2015/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Philip Morris Products S.A.
Quai Jeanrenaud 3
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
[2001/25]
Former [1999/48]For all designated states
FABRIQUES DE TABAC REUNIES S.A.
Quai Jeanrenaud 3 P.O. Box 11
2003 Neuchâtel-Serrières / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Tallier, Bernard
Chemin du Signal 11
2016 Cortaillod / CH
02 / Fiems, Jean-Pierre
Jean de la Grange 14
2000 Neuchatel / CH
[1999/48]
Representative(s)BOVARD AG
Patent- und Markenanwälte
Optingenstrasse 16
3013 Bern / CH
[N/P]
Former [1999/48]BOVARD AG - Patentanwälte
Optingenstrasse 16
3000 Bern 25 / CH
Application number, filing date98810491.526.05.1998
[1999/48]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0960831
Date:01.12.1999
Language:FR
[1999/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0960831
Date:07.11.2001
Language:FR
[2001/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:B65D85/10
[1999/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/48]
Extension statesLT29.04.2000
LV29.04.2000
RO29.04.2000
SI29.04.2000
TitleGerman:Mit einem Coupon versehene Verpackung sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung dieser Verpackung[1999/48]
English:Package comprising a coupon and process for obtaining said package[1999/48]
French:Emballage muni d'un coupon et procédé d'obtention dudit emballage[1999/48]
Examination procedure29.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/26]
10.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2001Fee for grant paid
01.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.08.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200003   M06   Fee paid on   21.07.2000
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2015/35]
Former [2002/49]GR07.11.2001
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0803450  (FOCKE & CO [DE]) [DA] 1;
 [DA]US5035935  (THOMAS DAVID A [US], et al) [DA] 1