Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974788

EP0974788 - Device for directed noise attenuation in a turbomachine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.10.2015
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2015No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.11.2015  [2015/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALSTOM Technology Ltd
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]For all designated states
Alstom Technology Ltd
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
Former [2004/14]For all designated states
ALSTOM Technology Ltd
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
ALSTOM (Switzerland) Ltd
CHSP Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5401 Baden / CH
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
Alstom
25, Avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Former [2000/31]For all designated states
ABB ALSTOM POWER (Schweiz) AG
Haselstrasse 16
5401 Baden / CH
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Asea Brown Boveri AG
Haselstrasse 16
5401 Baden / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Keller, Jakob, Prof. Dr.
Lindenbergstrasse 5
5610 Wohlen / CH
[2000/04]
Representative(s)General Electric Technology GmbH
Global Patent Operation - Europe
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/48](deleted)
...
Former [2001/50]Liebe, Rainer , et al
ALSTOM (Schweiz) AG Intellectual Property CHSP Haselstrasse 16/699, 5. Stock
5401 Baden / CH
Application number, filing date98810714.023.07.1998
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974788
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974788
Date:26.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:F23R3/02
[2014/30]
Former International [2000/04]F23M13/00, F23R3/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/40]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur gezielten Schalldämpfung innerhalb einer Strömungsmaschine[2000/04]
English:Device for directed noise attenuation in a turbomachine[2000/04]
French:Dispositif d'atténuation adaptée de bruit dans une turbomachine[2000/04]
Examination procedure10.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
17.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
30.04.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.2014Fee for grant paid
20.10.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.10.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.09.2013
Opposition(s)27.08.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/45]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
30.04.2014Request for further processing filed
30.04.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.05.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
13.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
28.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
15.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
20.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
08.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
07.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 14
06.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 15
08.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 16
08.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 17
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB2288660  (ABB MANAGEMENT AG) [Y] 1-8,10,12 * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 2 * * page 3, line 26 - line 34; claim 2 * * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 8; figure 3 *;
 [Y]US5431018  (KELLER JAKOB) [Y] 1-4,6-8,12 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 28; figures 2,3 *;
 [Y]DE4305333  (FASAG AG SUHR) [Y] 10 * figures 6,12; claims 1-12 *;
 [Y]  - ABOTT A. PUTNAM, Combustion-Driven Oscillations in Industry, NEW YORK, AMERICAN ELSEVIER, (1971), XP002087281 [Y] 1,5 * page 162; figure 9.5 *