Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0981188

EP0981188 - System for data transmission over low power distribution network and adaptor device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.05.2001 [2001/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ascom Systec AG
Gewerbepark
5506 Mägenwil / CH
[2000/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Widmer, Hanspeter
Bruggestr. 15
CG-5507 Mellingen / CH
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Roshardt, Werner Alfred
Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG
Eigerstrasse 2
Postfach
3000 Bern 14 / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Roshardt, Werner Alfred, Dipl.-Phys.
Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Zeughausgasse 5 Postfach
3000 Bern 7 / CH
Application number, filing date98810785.017.08.1998
[2000/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0981188
Date:23.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/719, H04B3/56
[2000/08]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/44]
Former [2000/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Anordnung zur Uebermittlung von Nachrichten über ein Niederspannungs-Stromversorgungsnetz sowie Zwischenstück[2000/08]
English:System for data transmission over low power distribution network and adaptor device[2000/08]
French:Système pour la transmission de données par le réseau de distribution électrique basse tension et adaptateur spécifique[2000/08]
Examination procedure24.08.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/20]
11.12.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/20]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
29.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
29.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
29.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
29.09.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
29.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
29.09.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
29.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
29.09.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
29.09.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
29.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
29.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
29.09.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
29.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
29.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
29.09.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
29.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
29.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
29.09.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE3148351  (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8 * page 5, paragraph 5 - page 7, paragraph 2 * * figure 3 * [A] 9;
 [A]US5115368  (SMITH LAWRENCE C [US]) [A] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 26; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0141673  (EMLUX LTD [GB]) [A] 1-3 * page 3, line 1 - line 26 * * page 4, line 20 - line 35 * * page 5, line 8 - line 32 * * figure 4 *