blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0981021

EP0981021 - Grate for incinerators [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.09.2003  [2003/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alstom
25, Avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
[2002/01]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
Asea Brown Boveri AG
Haselstrasse 16
5401 Baden / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Freiermuth, Friedrich
Mühlegasse 26
4314 Zeiningen / CH
02 / Künzli, Max
Im Vogelsang 6
5623 Boswil / CH
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Liebe, Rainer, et al
ALSTOM Technologie AG
CHTI Intellectual Property
Brown Boveri Strasse 7/699/5
5400 Baden / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/01]Liebe, Rainer, et al
ALSTOM (Switzerland)Ltd CHSP Intellectual Property Haselstrasse 16/699/5.OG
5401 Baden / CH
Former [2000/08]Pöpper, Evamaria, Dr., et al
Asea Brown Boveri AG Immaterialgüterrecht(TEI) Haselstrasse 16/699 I
5401 Baden / CH
Application number, filing date98810804.919.08.1998
[2000/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0981021
Date:23.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.1999
ClassificationIPC:F23H7/06
[2000/08]
CPC:
F23H7/06 (EP,US); F23G5/00 (KR)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/44]
Former [2000/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Rost für Verbrennungsanlagen[2000/08]
English:Grate for incinerators[2000/08]
French:Grille pour incinérateurs[2000/08]
Examination procedure24.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
01.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/36]
04.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]CH637198  (WIDMER & ERNST AG [CH]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE462953  (JOSEF MARTIN) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9629544  (KOCH THEODOR [CH]) [A] 2-4 * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 3 * * figures 5-7 *;
 [A]DE343719  (FRANZ KROEPELIN);
 [A]GB376389  (ALFRED EDWARD PARKER)
by applicantDE2547155
 CH637198
 EP0757206
 EP0844438
    - "THERMISCHE ABFALLBEHANDLUNG", EF-VERLAG FOR ENERGIE UND UMWELTTECHNIK, vol. 2, page 156-159
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.