Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980923

EP0980923 - Device for the insertion of weft threads in a multi-phase loom and multi-phase loom with such device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.06.2001
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.07.2001 [2001/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SULZER RÜTI AG
Caspar Honegger-Strasse
CH-8630 Rüti / CH
[2000/08]
Inventor(s)01 / De Jager, Godert, Dr.
Weiherhof 37
8604 Volketswil / CH
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Sulzer Management AG
Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 14
8401 Winterthur / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Sulzer Management AG
KS/Patente/0007 Zürcherstrasse 14
8401 Winterthur / CH
Application number, filing date98810807.219.08.1998
[2000/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980923
Date:23.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:D03D47/30
[2000/08]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/44]
Former [2000/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Eintragen von Schussfäden für eine Reihenfachwebmaschine und Reihenfachwebmaschine mit einer Vorrichtung[2000/08]
English:Device for the insertion of weft threads in a multi-phase loom and multi-phase loom with such device[2000/08]
French:Dispositif pour l'insertion des fils de trame dans un métier à tisser multiphase et métier à tisser multiphase avec un tel dispositif[2000/08]
Examination procedure24.08.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/29]
30.01.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/29]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
02.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
02.11.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0433216  (SULZER AG [CH]) [AD] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0143860  (RUETI AG MASCHF [CH]);
 [A]EP0685584  (RUETI AG MASCHF [CH])