Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0982609

EP0982609 - Sleeve for lightguide connection and connection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.04.2007
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Diamond SA
Via dei Patrizi 5
6616 Losone / CH
[2000/09]
Inventor(s)01 / De Marchi, Silverio
Via Monescia 20
6612 Ascona / CH
[2000/09]
Representative(s)Wenger, René , et al
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/09]Wenger, René , et al
Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
Application number, filing date98810823.921.08.1998
[2000/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0982609
Date:01.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0982609
Date:14.06.2006
Language:DE
[2006/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/38
[2000/09]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/45]
Former [2000/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Buchsenteil für eine Steckverbindung für Lichtwellenleiter und Steckverbindung[2000/09]
English:Sleeve for lightguide connection and connection[2000/09]
French:Douille pour connection d'un guide d'onde optique et connection[2000/09]
Examination procedure20.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
04.09.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
07.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE
16.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2006Fee for grant paid
01.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
29.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
01.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
02.10.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR14.06.2006
GB14.06.2006
IT14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
[2008/52]
Former [2008/22]GB14.06.2006
IT14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
FR09.03.2007
Former [2008/15]GB14.06.2006
IT14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
Former [2007/29]GB14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
Former [2007/21]NL14.06.2006
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0616236  (DIAMOND SA [CH]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *
ExaminationDE9103894U