blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0926274

EP0926274 - Elastic feeding trough [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  27.04.2007
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2007Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 30.05.2007  [2007/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG
Klosterstrasse 20
8406 Winterthur / CH
[2007/22]
Former [1999/26]For all designated states
MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG
Klosterstrasse 20
8406 Winterthur / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Wüst, Olivier
Gladiolenstrasse 29
8472 Seuzach / CH
02 / Schmid, René
Im Eggli 3
8525 Niederneunforn / CH
03 / Tobler, Martin
Nordstrasse 2
8620 Wetzikon / CH
[1999/26]
Application number, filing date98811105.004.11.1998
[1999/26]
Priority number, dateCH1997000295223.12.1997         Original published format: CH 295297
[1999/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0926274
Date:30.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0926274
Date:23.08.2000
[2000/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0926274
Date:02.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/23]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0926274
Date:30.05.2007
Language:DE
[2007/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.2000
ClassificationIPC:D01G15/20
[1999/26]
CPC:
D01G15/20 (EP); D01G9/16 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [2001/19]
Former [1999/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elastische Speisemulde[1999/26]
English:Elastic feeding trough[1999/26]
French:Auge élastique d'alimentation[1999/26]
Examination procedure25.09.2000Examination requested  [2001/24]
08.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.01.2004Fee for grant paid
28.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.02.2005  17.01.2006  WITHDRAWN
TRÜTZSCHLER GMBH & CO.KG Textilmaschinenfabrik
Postfach 41 01 64
41241 Mönchengladbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Vollrath, Ulrich
Trützschler GmbH & Co. KG
Textilmaschinenfabrik
Duvenstrasse 82-92
41199 Mönchengladbach / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2006/11]
Opponent(s)01  03.02.2005  17.01.2006  WITHDRAWN
TRÜTZSCHLER GMBH & CO.KG Textilmaschinenfabrik
Postfach 41 01 64
41241 Mönchengladbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Vollrath, Ulrich
Duvenstrasse 82-92
41199 Mönchengladbach / DE
Former [2005/13]
Opponent(s)01  03.02.2005  22.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
TRÜTZSCHLER GMBH & CO.KG Textilmaschinenfabrik
Postfach 41 01 64
41241 Mönchengladbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Vollrath, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing.
Duvenstrasse 82-92
41199 Mönchengladbach / DE
25.04.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.11.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.10.2006Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
12.10.2006Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.01.2007Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
17.04.2007Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB02.06.2004
[2005/45]
Documents cited:Search[YA]DE4038838  (TRÜTZSCHLER GMBH & CO KG) [Y] 1-5 * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 6 * * column 3, line 32 - line 51; figures 1,2; claims 1,8,11 * [A] 11;
 [Y]DE4416977  (RIETER INGOLSTADT SPINNEREIMASCHINENBAU) [Y] 1-5 * column 5, line 32 - column 10, line 20; figures 1,4; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0407732  (SCHUBERT &SALZER MASCHINENFABRIK AG) [A] 1 * page 1, column 4, line 8 - line 38; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0354426  (MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG) [A] 1,8,10 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 15; figure 11; claim 1 *;
 [A]AT373633B  (TEMAFA TEXTILMASCHINENFABRIK MEISSNER, MORGNER & CO GMBH) [A] 1 * page 5, line 22 - line 34; figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH0598520
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930817), vol. 17, no. 446, Database accession no. (C - 1098), & JP05098520 A 00000000 (IWAMOTO SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] * abstract *
OppositionDE4200394
 EP0275471
 DE4334035
 DE724906
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.