blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0926475


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.05.2009 Change - representative published on  24.06.2009  [2009/26]
20.10.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  22.11.2006  [2006/47]
01.07.2006 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
29.12.2005 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
17.11.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.11.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.12.2002 Renewal fee
26.10.2001 Renewal fee
02.01.2001 Change - extension states
03.11.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  20.12.2000 [2000/51]
24.10.2000 Renewal fee
23.06.2000 Request for examination filed published on  09.08.2000 [2000/32]
04.05.2000 Change - representative published on  21.06.2000 [2000/25]
25.02.2000 Publication of search report published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
11.06.1999 Change - inventor published on  28.07.1999 [1999/30]
13.05.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.06.1999 [1999/26]