blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0926475
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0926475Global Dossier 12.04.2000A3
EP0926475 30.06.1999A2
Priority number Date
DE19757190 22.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19757190 24.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19757190 22.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
NO985935L 23.06.1999L
NO985935D 17.12.1998D0
Priority number Date
DE19757190 22.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6073488 13.06.2000A
Priority number Date
DE19757190 22.12.1997