Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0926475

EP0926475 - Capacitive level sensor with integrated impurities film detection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.10.2006
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2009Change - representativepublished on 24.06.2009  [2009/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Research Ltd.
Affolternstrasse 52
8050 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [1999/26]For all designated states
ABB RESEARCH LTD.
Affolternstrasse 52
8050 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Byatt, Anthony, Dr.
Liebefelsweg 31
5313 Klingnau / CH
02 / Christen, Thomas, Dr.
Langhausstrasse 2
5300 Turgi / CH
03 / Kleiner, Thomas
Austrasse 13
5415 Rieden-Nussbaumen / CH
04 / Matter, Daniel, Dr.
Sommerhaldenstrasse 11c
5200 Brugg / CH
05 / Rüegg, Walter, Dr.
Sonnmattstrasse 7
5304 Endingen / CH
[1999/30]
Former [1999/26]01 / Byatt, Anthony, Dr.
Liebefelsweg 31
5313 Klingnau / CH
02 / Christen, Thomas, Dr.
Langhausstrasse 2
5300 Turgi / CH
03 / Kleiner, Thomas
Tobelrainli 13
5415 Nussbaumen / CH
04 / Matter, Daniel, Dr.
Sommerhaldenstrasse 11c
5200 Brugg / CH
05 / Rüegg, Walter, Dr.
Sonnmattstrasse 7
5304 Endingen / CH
Representative(s)ABB Patent Attorneys
c/o ABB Schweiz AG
Intellectual Property CH-IP
Brown Boveri Strasse 6
5400 Baden / CH
[N/P]
Former [2009/26]ABB Patent Attorneys
C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6
5400 Baden / CH
Former [2000/25]ABB Patent Attorneys
c/o ABB Business Services Ltd, Intellectual Property (SLE-I), Haselstrasse 16/699
5401 Baden / CH
Former [1999/26]Lück, Gert, Dr. , et al
Asea Brown Boveri AG Immaterialgüterrecht(TEI) Haselstrasse 16/699 I
5401 Baden / CH
Application number, filing date98811170.426.11.1998
[1999/26]
Priority number, dateDE199715719022.12.1997         Original published format: DE 19757190
[1999/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0926475
Date:30.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0926475
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01F23/26
[1999/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FI,   GB [2000/51]
Former [1999/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kapazitiver Füllstandssensor mit integrierter Schmutzfilmdetektion[1999/26]
English:Capacitive level sensor with integrated impurities film detection[1999/26]
French:Capteur de niveau capacitif avec détection intégrée de film d' impuretés[1999/26]
Examination procedure13.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
01.06.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/47]
05.07.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
05.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200508   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9504261  (ZATLER ANDREJ [SI], et al) [A] 1,4 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2175698  (SMITHS INDUSTRIES PLC) [A] 1,4 * abstract *