Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1008587

EP1008587 - Serine carbonates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.07.2001
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.09.2001 [2001/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Givaudan SA
Chemin de la Parfumerie 5
1214 Vernier / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
Givaudan SA
Chemin de la Parfumerie 5
1214 Vernier-Genève / CH
Former [2000/24]For all designated states
Givaudan Roure (International) S.A.
Chemin de la Parfumerie 5
1214 Vernier-Genève / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Anderson, Denise
Hottingerstrasse 5
8032 Zürich / CH
02 / Kumli, Frank
Gösgerstrasse 37
5015 Niedererlinsbach / CH
03 / Wittenberg, Jens
Meiershofstrasse 19
8600 Dübendorf / CH
04 / Streusand Goldman, Virginia
7833 Coddle Harbor Lane
Potomac, MD 20854 / US
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG
Dufourstrasse 101
Postfach
8034 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG
Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach
8034 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date98811209.008.12.1998
[2000/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1008587
Date:14.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07C271/22, C07C233/47, C07C229/28, A61K7/32, C07C229/22, C07C229/36, C07J41/00, C07F7/08
[2000/24]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/08]
Former [2000/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Serin-carbonate[2000/24]
English:Serine carbonates[2000/24]
French:Carbonates de sérine[2000/24]
Examination procedure15.12.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/37]
11.04.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.01.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
19.01.2001M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9219643  (PROPEPTIDE SA [FR]) [X] 1,5-7,9-15 * page 11, line 23 - line 32; examples 3,4 *;
 [DA]US5431904  (LANEY JUDITH W [US]) [DA] 1,17-20,23,26 * example -; claim - *;
 [DA]WO9111988  (GILLETTE CO [US]) [DA] 1,17-20,23,26 * example -; claim - *
 [X]  - DESSOLIN M ET AL, "New Allyl Group Acceptors for Palladium Catalyzed Removal of Allylic Protections and Transacylation of Allyl Carbamates", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (19950807), vol. 36, no. 32, page 5741-5744, XP004027593 [X] 1,5-7,9-15 * page 5743; example 6 *
 [X]  - BALDWIN J E ET AL, "Use of (S)-N-tert-Butoxycarbonylaziridine-2-carboxylate Derivatives for alpha-Amino Acid Synthesis", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (19960502), vol. 37, no. 21, page 3761-3764, XP004029254 [X] 1,5-7,9-15 * page 3762, compounds 7 and 8 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(96)00676-4
 [X]  - EUGEN SCHNABEL ET AL., "Umsetzungen von ter.-Butoxycarbonylfluorid mit trifunktionellen Aminosäuren", JUSTUS LIEBIGS ANNALEN DER CHEMIE, WEINHEIM DE, (1971), vol. 743, pages 57 - 68, XP002106785 [X] 1,5-7,9-15 * page 62, compound 3; page 67, lines 20 - 33 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jlac.19717430107
 [X]  - ERIC ATHERTON ET AL., "Peptide Synthesis. Part 12. 3,4-Dihydro-4-oxo-1,2,3-benzotriazin-3yl Esters of Fluorenylmethoxycarbonyl Amino Acids as Self-indicating Reagents for Solid Phase Peptide Synthesis", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 1., LETCHWORTH GB, (1988), pages 2887 - 2894, XP002106786 [X] 1,5-7,9-15 * page 2888, table, compound Fmoc-Ser(OBut)-ODhbt; page 2891, column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 16 *
 [X]  - KATSUE OKI ET AL., "The Resolution of N-Benzyloxycarbonyl-DL-amino Acids Using Ephedrine", BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN., TOKYO JP, (197008), vol. 43, no. 8, pages 2554 - 2558, XP002106787 [X] 1,5-7,9-15 * page 2555, table 1, line 4; page 2555, table 2, line 4; page 2556, table 3, line 4 and line 13; page 2557, column 1, line 3 from the bottom - column 2, line 6 *
 [X]  - YOSHIAKI KISO ET AL., "A Fluoride Ion Deprotection Strategy in Peptide Synthesis. Combination with Selective Deprotection Using the Dilute Methanesulphonic Acid of alpha-Amino Protecting Groups", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN., TOKYO JP, (198812), vol. 36, no. 12, pages 5024 - 5027, XP002106788 [X] 1,5-7,9-15 * page 5026, table I, last column *
 [X]  - A. LOFFET ET AL., "Allyl-based Groups for Side-chain Protection of Amino-acids", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PEPTIDE AND PROTEIN RESEARCH., COPENHAGEN DK, (1993), vol. 42, pages 346 - 351, XP000394373 [X] 1,5-7,9-15 * page 346, column 1, line 28 - line 34 * * page 349, column 1, line 17 - column 2, line 7 * * page 350, column 2, line 54 - page 351, column 1, line 31 *
 [X]  - MAX FRANKEL ET AL., "N-Carboxy-anhydrides of O-Acetyl- and O-Carbobenzyloxy-serine", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY., LETCHWORTH GB, (1952), pages 2735 - 2737, XP002106826 [X] 1,5-7,9-16 * page 2735, reaction scheme, compound (II); page 2736, lines 27 - 28; page 2736, line 41; page 2737, lines 9 - 10 *