Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0867152

EP0867152 - A dental turbo-handpiece with anti-suction system and method to implement the system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.08.2005
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.09.2005  [2005/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CASTELLINI S.p.A.
Via Saliceto, 22
I-40013 Castel Maggiore (Bologna) / IT
[N/P]
Former [1998/40]For all designated states
CASTELLINI S.p.A.
Via Saliceto, 22
I-40013 Castelmaggiore (Bologna) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Castellini, Franco
Piazza del Francia, 1
40124 Bologna / IT
[1998/40]
Representative(s)Lanzoni, Luciano
Bugnion S.p.A.
Via di Corticella, 87
40128 Bologna / IT
[N/P]
Former [1998/40]Lanzoni, Luciano
c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via dei Mille, 19
40121 Bologna / IT
Application number, filing date98830093.524.02.1998
[1998/40]
Priority number, dateIT1997BO0009525.02.1997         Original published format: IT BO970095
[1998/40]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0867152
Date:30.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0867152
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Type: A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication 
No.:EP0867152
Date:20.12.2000
[2000/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61C1/00, A61C1/05
[2000/02]
Former International [1998/40]A61C1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/38]
Former [1998/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zahnärtzliches Handstück mit Turboantrieb und Antisaugsystem und Verfahren zur Systemanwendung[1998/40]
English:A dental turbo-handpiece with anti-suction system and method to implement the system[1998/40]
French:Pièce à main dentaire à turbo avec systéme anti-aspiration et méthode de réalisation de ce systéme[1998/40]
Examination procedure09.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
13.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
28.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
19.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/38]
22.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
18.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
26.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
18.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200508   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19529668  (KALTENBACH & VOIGT [DE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *
by applicantDE1107891
 EP0664105
 US5507642