Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0884002

EP0884002 - Method for increasing the consistency of plant products in the form of pieces, in particular for diced tomato, [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.02.2004
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 07.07.2004  [2004/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIG Manzini S.p.A.
Via Paradigna, 94/A
43100 Parma / IT
[2002/42]
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
Sasib Processing & Seaming Machinery S.p.a.
Via Paradigna, 94/A
43100 Parma / IT
Former [1998/51]For all designated states
SASIB FOOD S.p.A.
Via Paradigna 94/A
43100 Parma / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Sommi, Franco
Via Maria Callas, 15
43100 Parma / IT
02 / Paciello, Gerardo
Vico III Mazzini, 7
85010 Pignola (Potenza) / IT
[1998/51]
Representative(s)Gotra, Stefano
BUGNION S.p.A.
Largo Michele Novaro, 1/A
43121 Parma / IT
[N/P]
Former [1998/51]Gotra, Stefano
Bugnion S.p.A. Via Garibaldi 22
43100 Parma / IT
Application number, filing date98830326.927.05.1998
[1998/51]
Priority number, dateIT1997PR0003406.06.1997         Original published format: IT PR970034
[1998/51]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0884002
Date:16.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0884002
Date:17.05.2000
[2000/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0884002
Date:09.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/212
[1998/51]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   IT [2001/04]
Former [1998/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Erhöhung der Konsistenz von stückigen Pflanzenprodukten, insbesondere stückigen Tomaten[1998/51]
English:Method for increasing the consistency of plant products in the form of pieces, in particular for diced tomato,[1998/51]
French:Méthode pour augmenter la consistance de produits végétaux sous forme de morceaux, en particulier morceaux de tomates[1998/51]
Examination procedure04.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
18.11.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, FI, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
25.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.2002Fee for grant paid
04.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.12.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE09.04.2003
DE10.07.2003
[2004/28]
Former [2004/23]DE10.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[T]WO9611588  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [T] 1 * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 5 *;
 [A]US4504504  (GAEHRING DAVID P [US], et al) [A] 1,2,9 * column 1, line 30 - line 41 * * column 2, line 32 - line 68 * * column 5, line 4 - line 6 * * example - *;
 [PA]WO9738591  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [PA] 1 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 4 * * page 4, line 28 - line 34 * * claim - *
 [DX]  J. D. FLOROS ET. AL., "Optimization of a Diced Tomato Calcification Process", JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, Chicago, illinois, usa, (199209), vol. 57, no. 5, pages 1144 - 1148, XP000674326 [DX] 1 * page 1144, column 2, paragraph 6 - page 1145, column 1, paragraph 1; table 2 * * page 1146, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 1147, column 2, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2621.1992.tb11284.x